Roberts v. Brogan et al

Plaintiff: William Scott Roberts
Defendant: William Brogan and Darci M Poloni
Case Number: 2:2017cv00865
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 12 Judge Leen's report and recommendation is ACCEPTED. This action is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff William Scott Roberts' Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall RETAIN 1 -1 the Complaint, and shall mail Plaintiff a blank IFP application for incarcerated litigants and blank form complaint for § 1983 civil rights. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Brogan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darci M Poloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scott Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?