Stevens et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Darlene Stevens and Scott Stevens |
Defendant: |
Kevin Prentice and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00970 |
Filed: |
April 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 26, 2019 |
Filing
103
ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 101 Order (Second Request). Calendar Call set for 12/31/2019 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Bench Trial set for 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 18, 2019 |
Filing
100
ORDER Granting 99 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 95 Order (First Request). Calendar Call reset for 11/27/2019 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Bench Trial reset for 12/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 20, 2018 |
Filing
87
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing
86
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 85 Wal-Mart's motion for leave to file surreply be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 81 the Stevens' motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 8, 2018 |
Filing
82
ORDER denying 67 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LN)
|
February 28, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Kevin Prentice, Only, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
17
ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation re Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 27, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER. The court is satisfied that the parties did not intentionally disregard 2 , 8 the court's Orders, and sanctions are not warranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 6/1/2017. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER re 2 Minute Order re Removal. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendants shall, no later than 5/16/2017, file and serve a signed statement. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?