Porretti v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: Wayne A Porretti
Defendant: Aranas, Dzurenda, Linda Fox, Adam Paul Laxalt, B Rio, Gov. Sandoval, Williams and Wonka
Case Number: 2:2017cv01745
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER Granting 380 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 357 , 361 Motions for Summary Judgment (Fifth Request). Responses due by 6/28/2021. Replies due by 7/12/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER Granting 374 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 357 , 361 Motions for Summary Judgment (Third Request). Responses due by 5/24/2021. Replies due by 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER Granting 373 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 106 , 130 Orders (First Request). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER Granting 369 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 357 , 361 Motions for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Responses due by 5/11/2021. Replies due by 5/25/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER Granting 366 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 106 , 130 Orders (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER Granting 351 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 344 Order (Fourth Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER Granting 343 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 339 Order (Third Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Granting 338 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 333 Order (Second Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Granting 332 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 328 Minutes of Proceedings (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 313 Stipulation to Extend Deadline set by 312 Order. The NDOC shall pay Dr. Roitman's relevant bills by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER Granting 307 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 283 Motion for Order to Show Cause (First Request). Replies due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Granting 296 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 283 Motion for Order to Show Cause (First Request). Responses due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Re: 270 Response. Hearing set for 8/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C by videoconference before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Two days before the hearing, Defendants shall produce documentation (see order for details). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 259 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Stay Enforcement of Preliminary Injunction Pending an Appeal of this Court's Order and Requesting a Decision from the Court no Later than 6/11/2020, as Time is of the Essence is DENIED as to the issuance of a stay and granted as to the expedited issuance of this order. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (ECF Nos. 32, 33). Defendants must submit a treatment plan within fourteen (14) days of this order. The NDOC shall be prepared upon approval of the treatment plan by the Court to immediately implement it by providing Mr. Porretti with the subject medications (Wellbutrin and Seroquel). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER TO PRODUCE WAYNE A. PORRETTI. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER to Produce Plaintiff for 9/19/2019 Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USM - JM) (Main Document 201 replaced on 9/12/2019) (BEL).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Granting 181 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 179 Order (First Request). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER. The court is in receipt of the attached summons and USM-285 form submitted by plaintiff. The court instructed plaintiff to submit a completed summons and USM-285 form for defendant Aranas, so that the U.S. Marshal could effect service. (Order, ECF No. 159 .) Having reviewed the submitted forms, page 3 of the USM-285 form is incomplete. Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to assist plaintiff in completing and submitting the forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 162 plaintiff's motion for judicial request for ECF file and to extend copy work is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 163 plaintiff's motion for clarification is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - For distribution to P via NNCC law library - MR)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 118 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of 106 this Court's Order, 132 Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Preliminary Injunction Pending the Filing of and the Court's Decision on Defendants' Mo tion for Reconsideration, and Any Necessary Appeal of this Court's Order, and 139 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration are DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 149 , 150 Defendants' Emerg ency Motion for Clarification and Expedited Decision Requested by 6/10/2019 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that Plaintiff be appointed counsel on appeal in light of his limited ability to quickly respond while incarcerated and while suffering from aggravated symptoms of his condition. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - MR)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants arrange and pay for two in-person medical evaluation of Plaintiff by 6/14/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 111 Plaintiff's Motion, which the Court construes as a request that the Court decline to consider Defendants' proposed medical examiner, is DENIED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 49 Plaintiff's Letter for Request on Ruling of Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 54 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Production is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause re Appointment Expert Witness, 76 Motion to Consider Moving Up Preliminary Injunction Hearing, 79 Motion to Disregard Defendant Response to ECF Doc 61 , and 84 Mot ion to Exhibit Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 Plaintiffs Request for 60 Day Continuance to Respond to Defendants' Motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is referred to the Court's pro bono program for appointment of counsel for the limited purpose representing him regarding this preliminary injunction motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all the medical re cords from Lake's Crossing Center referenced by Dr. Carroll at the 1/29/2019 hearing shall be provided to the Court under seal within thirty days of the issuance of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for 4/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - MR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 10 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED.The Clerk of the Court shall SEND a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office. The Clerk of the Court shall also SEN D a copy of this order to the attention of the Chief of Inmate Services for NDOC. The Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of 16 Plaintiff's second amended complaint on the Office of the Attorney G eneral of the State of Nevada by adding the AG to the docket sheet. This does not indicate acceptance of service.This case is no longer stayed. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance; NDOC Chief of Inmate Svcs - MR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 4 Motion to extend his copy work account in the amount of $3.00. The Nevada Department of Corrections shall extend Plaintiff's prison copy work limit by another $3.00.; Deferring ruling on 10 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the complaint. ECF No. [1-1].IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the entire complaint is dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend. If Plaintiff ch ooses to amend the complaint, amended complaint deadline is due within 30 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his original complaint. ECF No. [1-1]. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, he must use the approved form and he shall write the words First Amended above the words Civil Rights Complaint in the caption. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies outlined in this order, this action shall be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/30/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperi s application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before Friday, 10/27/2017, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachments in complian ce with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a); or (2) file an affidavit detailing the efforts he took to acquire a financial certificate and an inmate account statement from prison officials. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porretti v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Paul Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Rio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wonka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A Porretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?