Searle v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Kit R. Searle
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01937
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 44 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 3/21/2019 at 1:30 PM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. The confidential settlement statements shall be submitted in a sealed envelope marked confidential, no later than 3/14/2019 at 4:00 PM. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting ECF No. 20 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadline to 8/14/2018. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE ALLOWED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Substitution of Attorney (ECF No. 14 ) is GRANTED; James F. Holtz, George Ranalli, and Jason Fower of Ranalli Zaniel Fowler & Moran are substituted in the place of James F. Holtz formerly of the Law Office of James F. Holtz for defendant Walgreen Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searle v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kit R. Searle
Represented By: Brandon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: James F Holtz
Represented By: Cory R. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?