Strong v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: |
Stig Strong |
Defendant: |
Carson City Sheriff Department, Fry, Ken Furlong, Joe, State of Nevada and James Surratt |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02860 |
Filed: |
November 14, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
25
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice and 13 Fry's motion for summary judgment is DENIED without prejudice as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
February 28, 2019 |
Filing
23
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Stig Strong shall file written notification of his current address and contact information as required by LR IA3-1with the court on or before 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing
5
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis without having to prepay the full filing fee is GRANTED. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the attention of Chief of Inmate Services for th e Nevada Department of Prisons. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SHALL ISSUE a summons for Defendant Sergeant Fry, AND DELIVER THE SAME, to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk SHALL SEND to Plaintiff one (1) USM-285 forms. The Cl erk also SHALL SEND a copy of 4 the complaint and a copy of this order to the U.S. Marshal for service on Defendant(s). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
|
December 4, 2017 |
Filing
3
SCREENING ORDER. It is ordered that a decision on 1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is deferred. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall file 1 -1 the complaint. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of 1 -1 his original complaint. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff two copies of an in forma pauperis application form for a prisoner, one copy of the instructions for same, two copies of a blank 28 U.S.C. § 2254 habeas corpus form, and one copy of instructions for the same. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?