Adamson v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: |
Travontay Adamson |
Defendant: |
A. Emling, Glenn Fowler, Nevada Department of Corrections and Brian Williams |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00071 |
Filed: |
January 11, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2018 |
Filing
4
ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file another application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee in compliance with this Court's January 16, 2018, order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma paup eris by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a complete ifp applic ation or pay the filing fee. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECF No. 1-1), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank form w/instructions to plaintiff - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?