Harris v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregory Harris |
Defendant: |
Dr Romero Aranas, Byrne, S Carpenter, James Dzurenda, Jo Gentry, Dr K Gilreath, D Hininger, D Marr, W Sandie, T. Thomas and Warden Brian Williams |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00294 |
Filed: |
February 15, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 9, 2019 |
Filing
67
ORDERED that the CoreCivic Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 36 ) is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice against Defendants Hininger and Thomas for lack of personal jurisdiction. NDOC Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 50 ) is granted as to all claims except for the following two claims which are dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies: claim for interference with mail; and claim for deliberate indifference to medi cal needs as it relates to Plaintiff's hernia and hepatitis C. The Court thus grants summary judgment in favor of the NDOC Defendants as to Plaintiff's other claims. This action is dismissed without prejudice against Byrne and Jo Ge ntry for failure to effect service under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 10, 2019 |
Filing
52
ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Serve Defendants Jo Gentry and Byrne. Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants Jo Gentry and Byrne is Granted. Deadline: 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 13, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 26 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff must complete the summons forms and USM-285 forms and file them with the court by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing
22
ORDER that the clerk of court must send to Mr. Harris four blank summons forms and four blank USM-285 forms, along with a copy of this order. Plaintiff must complete the forms as stated in this order and file them with the court by 9/7/2018. Upon receipt of the proposed summonses and completed USM-285 forms from Plaintiff, the clerk of court must issue the summonses as stated in this order and must deliver the summonses, the USM-285 forms, a copy of the 8 amended complaint, and a copy of this order to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Summons, 285 forms, and this Order mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
|
July 2, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay an initial installment of the filing fee. The Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this Order and a copy of Plaintiff's 8 Amended Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General. Service must be perfected within 90 days from the date of this order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance and mailed to Chief of Inmate Services - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?