Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Alston Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust and Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Vacation Trust
Defendant: Alston Construction Company, Inc., Aria Resort & Casino LLC, Bellagio LLC, Kiewit Infrastructure West Co., MGM Resorts International and Kenneth M. Mercurio
Case Number: 2:2018cv00416
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, MGM Resorts International, and Bellagio, LLC and add MGM Resorts Design and Development (MRDD) as the Real Party in Interest. Defendant MRDD shall file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint within 5 days of the Court's approval of this Stipulation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 4, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation to Extend Time. MGM Resorts International answer due 6/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. MGM Resorts International answer due 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 9, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. MGM Resorts International answer due 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 30, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. MGM Resorts International answer due 5/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 2, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. answer due 5/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Alston Construction Company, Inc. answer due 4/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Alston Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alston Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellagio LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Mercurio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Vacation Trust
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?