Riggs et al v. Airbus Helicopters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Riggs
Defendant: Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S., Scott Booth, Brenda Halvorson, Daniel Friedman, Xebec LLC, Matthew Hecker, Geoffrey Edlund, Elling Halvorson, John Becker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Papillon Airways, Inc. doing business as Papillon Grand Canyon Helicopters, Lon A Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson and Elling B. Halvorson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00912
Filed: May 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 66 COSTS TAXED in the amount of $ 0.00 against Defendant. (JM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 65 CLERK'S MEMORANDUM regarding taxation of costs. (JM)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying #59 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/7/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to #59 Motion for Attorney Fees,, by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Smith, Lawrence)
July 28, 2020 Filing 62 OBJECTION to #60 Bill of Costs, Specially Appearing Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. Response to Objection to Bill of Costs due by 8/4/2020. (Bice, Todd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE to #59 Motion for Attorney Fees,, by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. Replies due by 8/4/2020. (Bice, Todd)
July 14, 2020 Filing 60 BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 7/28/2020. Tax Bill of Costs by 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Gary C. Robb, #2 Exhibit Instructions from the Office of the Clerk, #3 Exhibit Invoice from Becker Gallagher Legal Publishing, Inc.) (Smith, Lawrence)
July 14, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. Responses due by 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Gary C. Robb, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Anita Porte Robb, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from 46th Annual Survey, #4 Exhibit Itemization and Description of All Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Gary Robb, #5 Exhibit Itemization and Description of All Attorneys fees and Costs for Anita Robb) (Smith, Lawrence)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER on Mandate re #55 USCA Opinion AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to #51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Airbus Helicopters, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 30, 2020 Filing 56 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit and Denial of Writ of Certiorari as to #55 USCA Memorandum/Opinion (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 55 OPINION of USCA, Ninth Circuit, AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to #51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Airbus Helicopters, Inc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #46 Motion to Stay Case, Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Airbus Helicopters, Inc. Appellant's emergency motion to stay the district court's 7/16/18 order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. 2) is granted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2018 Filing 52 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #51 Notice of Appeal, filed by Airbus Helicopters, Inc. USCA Case Number 18-16396. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #45 ORDER by Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-5171989. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Bice, Todd) Modified on 7/30/2018 to establish docket entry relationship (DKJ).
July 24, 2018 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. Replies due by 7/31/2018. (Severino, Mark)
July 20, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #46 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bice, Todd)
July 19, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. Replies due by 7/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Table B-4A: U.S. Court of Appeals - Median Time Intervals in Months for Civil and Criminal Appeals Terminated on the Merits, by Circuit) (Robb, Gary)
July 18, 2018 Filing 47 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #46 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. (Bice, Todd)
July 18, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. (Bice, Todd)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Remand to State Court; ORDER granting #19 Motion to Remand to State Court; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Certified Docket to State Court - JM)
July 13, 2018 Filing 44 JOINDER to #40 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
July 13, 2018 Filing 43 JOINDER to #39 Motion by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
July 13, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to #40 MOTION to Shorten Time; filed by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Robb, Gary)
July 12, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION to Shorten Time; filed by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. Replies due by 7/19/2018. (Bice, Todd)
July 11, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Shorten Time re #36 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Gary C. Robb) (Robb, Gary)
July 11, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Defer Briefing re #36 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. Responses due by 7/25/2018. (Robb, Gary)
July 11, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
July 11, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Deposition Excerpt of AHI Vice President Lindsay Cunningham, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Deposition Excerpt of Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S. Engineer Pierre Prudhomme-Lacroix) (Robb, Gary)
July 9, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. Responses due by 7/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bice, Todd)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #27 Verified Petition for Permission for Corey J. Wright to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Verified Petition for Permission for Kathryn Grace to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Verified Petition for Permission for Robert S. Velevis to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Todd Bice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Verified Petition for Permission for Yvette Ostolaza to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Todd Bice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 2, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn A. Grace and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5143448) by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
July 2, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Yvette Ostolaza and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Todd L. Bice (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5142854) by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. (Bice, Todd)
July 2, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert S. Velevis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Todd L. Bice (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5142846) by Defendants Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.. (Bice, Todd)
June 29, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court, #19 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. Replies due by 7/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Bice, Todd)
June 29, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Corey J. Wright and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5141581) by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William J. Katt for John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., and Xebec LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick J. Kearns for John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., and Xebec LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 27, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William J. Katt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5137953) by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
June 27, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Kearns and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark C. Severino (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5137932) by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Stipulation; Re: #15 Motion to Remand to State Court, #19 Motion to Remand to State Court, Responses due by 6/29/2018. Replies due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 19, 2018 Filing 21 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #15 , #16 and #19 Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. (Bice, Todd)
June 18, 2018 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Smith, Lawrence)
June 15, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED MOTION to Remand to State Court; filed by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2018. (Severino, Mark)
June 15, 2018 Filing 18 NON-OPPOSITION to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
June 15, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Non-Compliant filing with LR IC 2-2: ERROR - Document #16 contains two (2) causes of actions. Document should have been filed as separate entries by attorney, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). CORRECTION: Attorney Mark C Severino is advised to only refile the Response to Motion contained in document #16 , as separate filings, using the appropriate event pursuant to LR IC 2-2 (b) and LR IC 2-2(c). Additionally, documents should be properly linked to the appropriate document(s) already filed, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (RFJ)
June 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court; filed by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling B. Halvorson, Elling Kent Halvorson, Lon A Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2018. (Severino, Mark) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b), LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Mark C Severino. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file document pursuant to the local rules regarding electronic filing procedures on 6/15/2018 (RFJ).
June 8, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. Responses due by 6/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order in Repsher v. Air Methods Corp., et al.) (Smith, Lawrence)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission for Gary C. Robb to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lawrence J. Smith. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission for Anita Porte Robb to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lawrence J. Smith. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2018 Filing 12 EXHIBIT LIST; filed by Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. (Bice, Todd)
June 1, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. (Bice, Todd)
June 1, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anita Porte Robb and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lawrence J. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5106548) by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Smith, Lawrence)
June 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary C. Robb and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lawrence J. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5106530) by Plaintiff Mary Riggs. (Smith, Lawrence)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants are hereby permitted Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 20 days following this Court's decision on Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/25/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christina A Katt, William J. Katt, Corey Wright and Kathryn A Grace to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/9/2018. (no image attached) (RFJ)
May 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance; filed by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Severino, Mark)
May 24, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Defendants John Becker, Scott Booth, Geoffrey Edlund, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, Elling Halvorson, Matthew Hecker, Papillon Airways, Inc., Xebec LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Severino, Mark)
May 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Anita Porte Robb, Gary C. Robb, Robert S. Velevis, Yvette Ostolaza to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/2/2018. (no image attached) (JM)
May 18, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/2/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Airbus Helicopters, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Airbus SE, Other Affiliate Airbus Group, Inc. for Airbus Helicopters, Inc. added. (Bice, Todd)
May 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-770467-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5091931) by Airbus Helicopters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Bice, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs et al v. Airbus Helicopters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Helicopters, S.A.S.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Booth
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Halvorson
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Friedman
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xebec LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hecker
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Edlund
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elling Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Becker
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papillon Airways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Helicopters, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Velevis
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papillon Airways, Inc. doing business as Papillon Grand Canyon Helicopters
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lon A Halvorson
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elling Kent Halvorson
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elling B. Halvorson
Represented By: Patrick Joesph Kearns
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark C Severino
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Christina A Katt
Represented By: Corey J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Riggs
Represented By: Gary C. Robb
Represented By: Anita Porte Robb
Represented By: Lawrence J Smith
Represented By: Gary Charles Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?