Johnston v. Viva Capital LLC

Plaintiff: David Johnston
Defendant: Viva Capital LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00073
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain #1 -1 the Complaint. Payment of filing fees due 3/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/1/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/14/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Viva Capital LLC by Viva Capital LLC. filed by Viva Capital LLC.(Thompson, Wolfe) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Viva Capital LLC. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Thompson, Wolfe)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, filed by Plaintiff David Johnston. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (ADR)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IS HEREBY ORDERED that #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibit Records is granted. Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Allow Exhibits Over 100 Pages and #6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff David Johnston. (ADR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by US Marshals, filed by Plaintiff David Johnston. Responses due by 1/24/2019.(ADR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re 2 Exhibit, filed by Plaintiff David Johnston. (ADR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal 2 Exhibit, filed by Plaintiff David Johnston. (ADR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ADR)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Viva Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viva Capital LLC
Represented By: Wolfe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?