May v. Mattinnson et al
Plaintiff: Gregory May
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams, Associate Warden Jennifer Nash, Theresa Wicham, Dr Martin Washington, Scott Mattinson, Jennifer Nash, Martin Naughton and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 2/20/2019 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Gregory May, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Jared Frost, Deputy A.G.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 12:27 PM - 12:45 PM; Courtroom: 7C.Pro se plaintiff is present in custody appearing telephonically. Defense counsel and Jennifer Nash, Associate Warden are present, appearing telephonically. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations of plaintiff and counsel/warden as to the #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, IT IS ORDERED that [1-1] Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint within 60 days or risk dismissal of the case without prejudice. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/15/2019. IT IS ORDERED that #8 Defendants' Motion for Telephonic Conference is GRANTED and the parties are ordered to appear at a telephonic conference on February 20, 2019 at 12:15 PM. The Court clarifies its intent in its February 14, 2019 Order that Defendants be present on the telephone call along with Plaintiff. The Court will initiate the call to the plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #7 Motion for Special Appearance is DENIED, though the Court reiterates its February 5, 2019 Order that Plaintiff be permitted to allow other inmates to read Court documents to him and to prepare Court documents on his behalf. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (BEL).
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Motion by Defendants Jennifer Nash, Martin Naughton, Brian Williams. Replies due by 2/21/2019. (Frost, Jared)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Telephonic Conference re 6 Minute Order, by Defendants Jennifer Nash, Martin Naughton, Brian Williams. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Frost, Jared)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/14/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants are directed to ensure that #5 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is read aloud to Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are directed to permit Plaintiff to place a telephone call to chambers regarding the representations in Defendants' submission by February 22, 2019. Plaintiff is directed to confirm with the Court that all of the actions noted by the Defendants have been done. Following the receipt of this communication, the Court will consider whether to deny Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction as moot based on the accommodations now in place. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Special Appearance by Stephen Kern in response to 6 Minute Order, by Plaintiff Gregory May. Responses due by 2/27/2019. (MMM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to ( #1 -1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Order, by Defendants Jennifer Nash, Martin Naughton, Brian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Frost, Jared)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jared M Frost on behalf of Defendants Jennifer Nash, Martin Naughton, Brian Williams. (Frost, Jared)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Scott Mattinson, Jennifer Nash, Martin Naughton, Theresa Wicham, Brian Williams (Filing fee $400 - NOT paid) by Gregory May. (MMM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall re-file the Motion at ECF No. 1 as the complaint and shall send Plaintiff a courtesy copy of the complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 1) on the Attorney General's Office. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is referred to the Courts pro bono program for appointment of counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that, as appointment of counsel is pending, Plaintiff be permitted to allow other inmates to read Court documents to him and to prepare Court documents on his behalf. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for High Desert State Prison file a special appearance with the Court by February 12, 2019. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file any Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 1) by February 14, 2019.Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: Pro Bono Liaison - MMM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Protective Order) (MMM)
January 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Mattinnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Wicham
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Martin Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mattinson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Represented By: Jared M Frost
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Naughton
Represented By: Jared M Frost
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Jared M Frost
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?