Jones v. Desert Palace, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Jones
Defendant: Parball Newco, LLC, 3535 LV Newco, LLC and Desert Palace, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01085
Filed: June 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
2 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01085-JCM-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Jones re #3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Balaban, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald Jones. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Balaban, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
June 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR)
June 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3535 LV NEWCO, LLC dba LINQ, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, DESERT PALACE, LLC dba Caesars Palace, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, PARBALL NEWCO, LLC dba Ballys Las Vegas, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5598217) by Ronald Jones. Proof of service due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Desert Palace, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jones
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parball Newco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3535 LV Newco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Palace, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?