Arnold v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Marie Arnold
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01090
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #15 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Defendant Target Corporation. Replies due by 8/29/2019.(Bailus, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerks Default and #19 Motion Requesting FRCP 16-2 Order is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 9/6/2019, in LV Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION Requesting FRCP 16-2 (a), (d) Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference, by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. Responses due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MR)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Motion for Default Judgment, by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. (MR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #13 Response to #9 Motion for Default Judgment, by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. (MR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #14 Withdrawal of Motion, #15 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (MR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit In Support of Request, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (MR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 WITHDRAWAL of #9 Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. (MR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 Motion for Default Judgment by Defendant Target Corporation. Replies due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Declaration of Barbara Pederson, #8 Declaration of Mark B. Bailus, Esq.) (Bailus, Mark)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Loren Young on behalf of Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #9 Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. (JM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #9 Motion for Default Judgment by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment, by Plaintiff Marie Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (MR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Answer to Complaint, #7 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Target Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Young, Loren)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Target Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/31/2019.(Young, Loren) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed, filed by Marie Arnold re #2 Summons Issued. Target Corporation served on 6/25/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (JQC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by Marie Arnold. Target Corporation served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (MR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Target Corporation re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation (Filing fee $400) by Marie Arnold. Proof of service due by 9/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS064504) (MR)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Loren Young
Represented By: Mark Bradley Bailus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?