Bellile v. MGM Resorts International et al
Plaintiff: James Bellile
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Case Number: 2:2019cv01092
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
2 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to my chambers, U.S. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, in a sealed envelope-MARKED CONFIDENTIAL AND DO NOT FILE, not later than 4:00 p.m., September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding ECF No. #9 . Document is not in compliance with #7 Clerk's Notice, which states: All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01092-JCM-DJA. Counsel is advised to correct the case number before filing any further documents to be in compliance with #7. No further action is required to #9 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to answer complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (Howell, Dana)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bellile. MGM Resorts International served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Lizada, Angela)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01092-JCM-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MGM Resorts International. (JM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Registered Agent by Plaintiff James Bellile. (Lizada, Angela)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MGM Resorts International. (JM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Bellile. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lizada, Angela)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5599152) by James Bellile. Proof of service due by 9/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lizada, Angela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellile v. MGM Resorts International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bellile
Represented By: Angela J Lizada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Represented By: Dana Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?