Denney v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Lidette Denney
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01157
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Deeming #7 Order to Show Cause Satisfied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01157-APG-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Motions due by 1/29/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lidette Denney. (Philippus, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #12 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Loren Young and Mark Bailus. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01157-APG-CWH. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Lidette Denney (Philippus, Scott)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Loren Young on behalf of Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Remanded. Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lidette Denney. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Philippus, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/3/2019. Defendant filed an answer in state court prior to removal. See Docket No. 1-2 at 18. The parties must file a proposed discovery plan by July 24, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
July 3, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/3/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/18/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Target Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (JM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-790653-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5610772) by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Certificate of Service)(Young, Loren) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denney v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidette Denney
Represented By: Scott Eric Philippus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Loren Young
Represented By: Mark Bradley Bailus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?