Litchfield v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Litchfield
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01222
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01222-JAD-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Target Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Westbrook, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file their Certificates as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 8/15/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Target Corporation. (Westbrook, Alan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/12/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/27/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-18-784400-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5621860) by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Request for Exemption, #5 Exhibit Decision on Exemption from Arbitration, #6 Exhibit Stipulation and Order for Confidentiality and Protection, #7 Exhibit Notc of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Confidentiality and Protection)(Westbrook, Alan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litchfield v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Alan W Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Litchfield
Represented By: Ronaldo Bumbasi
Represented By: Scott Poisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?