Fasthorse v. State of Nevada
Plaintiff: Lavern Charles Fasthorse
Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2019cv01442
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of State of Nevada against Lavern Charles Fasthorse. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Payment of filing fees or IFP due within 30 days from date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Federal Tort Claim) (JM)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fasthorse v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavern Charles Fasthorse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?