Clark County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Clark County
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Sunrise Lee, Jonathan D Sackler, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Michael J Gurry, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Theresa Sackler, Steven A. Holper, M.D., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC, Actavis LLC, Steven A Holper, M.D., Professional Corporation, CVS Tennessee Distribution LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Allergan USA Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Beacon Company, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, CVS Health Corporation, Rosebay Medical Company L.P., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Actavis Pharma, Inc., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., Aida B Maxsam, Walmart Inc., Richard S Sackler, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, C & R Pharmacy, Alec Burlakoff, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC, Richard M Simon, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., John Kapoor, Kathe A Sackler, Specgx LLC, Actavis, Inc., Allergan Inc., Joseph A Rowan and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01616
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint contained within #1 Petition for Removal filed by Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC.(Smith, John) Modified on 10/24/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
October 21, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #31 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand and Denying Motion to Stay) (Adams, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Federal Preliminary Injunctive Order by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.. (Fears, Chad)
October 16, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #36 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 16, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by C & R Pharmacy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Daehnke, Patricia)
October 14, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #31 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Replies due by 10/21/2019. (Hutchison, Mark)
October 11, 2019 Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Hutchison, Mark)
October 11, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE Clark County's Combined Supplement to its Motion to Remand [Dkt 7] and Opposition to Walgreens' Motion to Stay Proceedings [Dkt 22] by Clark County re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, #22 Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Adams, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Shorten Time re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit In Support of Plaintiff CC Motion for Order Shortening Time, #2 Exhibit 2 - CTO - 113) (Adams, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Notice of Removal) (Adams, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hutchison, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #24 Verified Petition for Permission John A. Smith to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/4/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #24 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Terry, Brian)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Stipulation; Status Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 26 First STIPULATION re Discovery Stipulation And Order To Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Plaintiff's Motion To Remand re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #24 . Missing a Certificate of Good Standing. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #24 . Do NOT link to this notice. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 VIEW #28 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Andrew "Jack" Smith and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5721107) by Defendant Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Terry, Brian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Hutchison, Mark)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Clark County. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Vacate CTO, #4 Exhibit 4 - VA Order) (Adams, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Hutchison, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hutchison, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation added. (Rickard, Jarrod)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hutchison, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lester C. Houtz and Alex J. Harris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/8/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. (Lundvall, Patricia)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re #1 Petition for Removal by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Hutchison, Mark) Modified on 9/24/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aida B Maxsam. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barr, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Aida B Maxsam. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2019.(Barr, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John Andrew Smith to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/4/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #8 . Attorney Hayley Miller is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mark S. Cheffo, Mara Cusker Gonzalez, Lindsay Zanello to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/1/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P. (Fears, Chad)
September 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Clark County. Responses due by 9/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - City of Reno v. Purdue Pharma - Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - State of Delaware v. Purdue Pharma - Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 3 - WV v. McKesson - Memorandum Opinion & Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - County of Anderson v. Rite Aid - Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Weber County - Memorandum Decision & Order, #6 Exhibit Uintah County v. Purdue Pharma - Memorandum Decision & Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Regarding Remands, #8 Exhibit 8 - CMO, #9 Exhibit 9 - Dinwiddie City v. Purdue Pharma, LP, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order Directing Answer, #11 Exhibit 11 - Transcript (Excerpts)) (Adams, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Party Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. terminated pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice; filed by Plaintiff Clark County. (Adams, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Adriana Riviere-Badell and Julian W Park to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/28/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Express Scripts Holding Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Anna) Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation added Modified on 9/17/2019 (MMM).
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Express Scripts, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Anna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court for Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-17-765828-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5701594) by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration re Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Anna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Adam R Trippiedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Anna M Martin
Represented By: Julian W Park
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Guinn
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 6 Inc.
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Hayley E. Miller
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lindsay Zanello
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: John Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Represented By: Stacy H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Represented By: Rosa Solis-Rainey
Represented By: Nathan Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Gurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414 LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Holper, M.D.
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Adam R Trippiedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Hayley E. Miller
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lindsay Zanello
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: John Andrew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A Holper, M.D., Professional Corporation
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Adam R Trippiedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Tennessee Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA Inc.
Represented By: Max E. Corrick
Represented By: Jennifer B. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Hayley E. Miller
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lindsay Zanello
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Hayley E. Miller
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lindsay Zanello
Represented By: Mara Cusker Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida B Maxsam
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Represented By: Joseph D. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Steven J Boranian
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Lawrence J Semenza, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & R Pharmacy
Represented By: Patricia E. Daehnke
Represented By: Laura S Lucero
Represented By: Amanda Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Burlakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Technologies LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Anna M Martin
Represented By: Julian W Park
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Max E. Corrick
Represented By: Jennifer B. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark County
Represented By: Robert M. Adams
Represented By: Richard Hy
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Cassandra Cummings
Represented By: Steven B Wolfson
Represented By: Erica D. Entsminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?