Davis v. Ranas et al
Plaintiff: Lance Davis
Defendant: Collette Ball, Michael Minev, Dwayne Deal, Jerry Howell, Ben Gutierrez and Romeo Ranas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01832
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Lance Davis. (JQC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time to Answer by Plaintiff Lance Davis. (SLD)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/6/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment,. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 JOINDER to #7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Collette Ball. (VanSickle, Wade)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 JOINDER to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Collette Ball. (VanSickle, Wade)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Collette Ball. Responses due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (VanSickle, Wade)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Collette Ball. Responses due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VanSickle, Wade) Modified event on 12/6/2019 (DKJ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/22/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/22/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #6 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re #1 Complaint by Defendants Ben Gutierrez, Jerry Howell. Responses due by 12/12/2019. (VanSickle, Wade)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendants Ben Gutierrez, Jerry Howell. Responses due by 12/5/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/21/2019. (VanSickle, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Lance Davis as to Dwayne Deal, Michael Minev, Romeo Ranas re #3 Summons Issued. (JM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance Davis re #3 Summons Issued. Collette Ball served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019; Ben Gutierrez served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019; Jerry Howell served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (JM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collette Ball, Dwayne Deal, Ben Gutierrez, Jerry Howell, Michael Minev, Romeo Ranas by Lance Davis. Proof of service due by 1/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS066602)(JQC)
October 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Ranas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collette Ball
Represented By: Wade J. VanSickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Represented By: Wade J. VanSickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gutierrez
Represented By: Wade J. VanSickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Ranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?