Davis et al v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jody Bacon and Cody Davis
Defendant: David Mar, Kim Adamson, Nevada Department of Corrections, Michael Minev, Martin Naughton, James Dzurenda and Marsha Johns
Case Number: 2:2019cv01897
Filed: October 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
3 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. #13 Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal (LE)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jody Bacon. Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Olifant, Scott)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that William L. Schmidt is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DRM)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Jeffrey W. Eisinger is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DRM)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Joint Status Conference held on 12/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Adam Hosmer-Henner, Chelsea Latino, and (By telephone) Frederick Melms, Leo Wolpert, Ryan Hamilton, and Scott Olifant; Def Counsel: Douglas Rands and Randall Gilmer; Recording start and end times: 10:03:24 - 10:34:57; Courtroom: 1; Mr. Olifant advises that Chief Judge Du recently issued an order of dismissal #9 and further advises that he sees no reason to go forward with this case and does not intend to file an amended complaint as ordered within thirty days. The Court finds that Mr. Olifant is granted leave to file a voluntary dismissal of this action pursuant to Rule 41 and suggests that he do so by no later than the end of this month. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER - That the Eighth Amendment, ADA, and RA claims are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. The negligence claims are dismissed without prejudice and without leave to amend. Plaintiff must file the amended complaint within 30 days from the date of entry of this order (12/26/2019). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/13/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A status conference is set for 12/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19577. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 13, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (WJ)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Case reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01897-MMD-CBC. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du, Judge James C. Mahan on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #3 .Wrong form used: pursuant to LR IA 11-2, applications must be by verified petition on the form furnished by the clerk and downloaded from the Court's website. Form was not notarized. Incomplete case number on document. No Certificate(s) of Good Standing attached. Attorneys Scott Olifant and William Schmidt are advised to correct the deficiencies and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #3 . (no image attached) (MMM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey W. Eisinger to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/12/2019. (no image attached) (JM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
October 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)
October 27, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William L. Schmidt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott B. Olifant (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5752819) by Plaintiff Cody Davis. (Olifant, Scott) Document not filed pursuant to LR IA 11-2. Modified on 10/28/2019 (MMM).
October 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cody Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Olifant, Scott)
October 27, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5752817) by Cody Davis. Proof of service due by 1/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Olifant, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Bacon
Represented By: William L. Schmidt
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Eisinger
Represented By: Scott B. Olifant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Davis
Represented By: William L. Schmidt
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Eisinger
Represented By: Scott B. Olifant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?