Hannah v. Lombardo et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hannah
Defendant: C/O Binko, Lombardo, Gouldie and Armendairiz
Case Number: 2:2019cv01944
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Michael Hannah. (SLD)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
November 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-07023. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (ADR)
November 5, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the District of Nevada. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/5/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/5/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/5/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Hannah. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/5/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Armendairiz, Binko, Gouldie, Lombardo. Filed byMichael Hannah. Consent/Declination due by 11/25/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannah v. Lombardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Binko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gouldie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armendairiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?