Thorne et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Southern Arms, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Robert D. Thorne, G and D Group, Diplopoint, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd and Dave Sheer Guns
Defendant: Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State and Mike Miller
Case Number: 2:2019cv01982
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 28 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint. USCA Case Number 19-17606. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #25 Notice of Appeal, by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Southern Arms, Robert D. Thorne. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 26 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Southern Arms, Robert D. Thorne re #25 Notice of Appeal,. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 VIEW #27 corrected image re NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #24 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-5826732. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement) (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/23/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Southern Arms, Robert D. Thorne. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 DDTC Penalties - Webpage, #3 Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Gareth Denysschen, #4 Exhibit 3 Personal Reference, #5 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Tony Jason Harmse, #6 Exhibit 5 DDTC Blue Lantern Webpage, #7 Exhibit 6 Supplemental Affidavit of Barbara Denysschen, #8 Exhibit 7 Supplemental Affidavit of Robert Throne) (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Verified Petition for Permission for Robert A. Bernheim to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jordan Smith. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Verified Petition for Permission for Matthew A. Goldstein to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State. Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Catherine Hamilton) (Soskin, Eric)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert A. Bernheim and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5802665) by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Southern Arms, Robert D. Thorne. (Smith, Jordan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew A. Goldstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5800865) by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Southern Arms, Robert D. Thorne. (Smith, Jordan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric J. Soskin on behalf of Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State. (Soskin, Eric)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, Robert D. Thorne, Southern Arms re #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,,. (Smith, Jordan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, Robert D. Thorne, Southern Arms re #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,,. Michael R. Pompeo served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Smith, Jordan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, Robert D. Thorne, Southern Arms re #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,,. Mike Miller served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Smith, Jordan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, Robert D. Thorne, Southern Arms re #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,,. Directorate of Defense Trade Controls served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Smith, Jordan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, Robert D. Thorne, Southern Arms re #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,,. U.S. Department of State served on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Smith, Jordan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State. (Flake, Troy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew A. Goldstein, Robert A. Bernheim to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/29/2019. (no image attached) (JM)
November 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (JM)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dave Sheer Guns. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Diplopoint. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Southern Arms. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by G and D Group. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Dave Sheer Guns, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, G and D Group, Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Southern Arms, Robert D. Thorne. Responses due by 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Appendix Appendix) (Smith, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5775155) by Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd, Dave Sheer Guns, G and D Group, Barbara J. Dennysschen, Diplopoint, Robert D. Thorne, Southern Arms. Proof of service due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons DDTC, #4 Summons Miller, #5 Summons Pompeo, #6 Summons U.S. Department of State, #7 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Smith, Jordan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorne et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directorate of Defense Trade Controls
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Miller
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Arms
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Dennysschen
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Thorne
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G and D Group
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diplopoint
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pretoria Arms Pty Ltd
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Sheer Guns
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A Goldstein
Represented By: Robert A. Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?