City of North Las Vegas v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of North Las Vegas
Defendant: Actavis Inc., Beverly Sackler, Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd, Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., CVS Tennessee Distribution L.L.C., Jonathan D Sackler, McKesson Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Aida B Maxsam, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, David A. Sackler, Allergan USA Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Steven A. Holper, Beacon Company, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Rosebay Medical Company L.P., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Richard S Sackler, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Actavis Pharma, Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, C & R Pharmacy, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC, Steven A. Holper M.D., Specgx LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Noramco, Inc., Kathe A Sackler, Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC, Allergan Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02143
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #7 the city's motion to remand be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #18 defendants' motion for a temporary stay pending likely transfer to multidistrict litigation be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter of City of North Las Vegas v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al., case number 2:19-cv-02143-JCM-DJA, be, and the same hereby is, REMANDED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court - ADR)
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #18 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Order Staying Actions, #3 Exhibit Order) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #12 Joinder to #9 Stipulation to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Plaintiff City of North Las Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Remand Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order of Severance and Order of Remand) (Adams, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #18 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff City of North Las Vegas. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand and Denying Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Vacating CTO, #4 Exhibit 4 - VA Order) (Adams, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minutes of the Court (ECF 6)) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Fourth Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction by Aida B Maxsam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Barr, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time re #7 Motion to Remand. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/19/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation added. (Rickard, Jarrod)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Allegiance Corporation, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 100, Inc. for Cardinal Health Inc.; Other Affiliate EPIC Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 8, LLC for Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC added. (Jorgensen, J)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 JOINDER to #9 Stipulation by Defendants Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC. (Jorgensen, J)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by McKesson Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Solis-Rainey, Rosa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by City of North Las Vegas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) to Continue the Responsive Pleading until 45 days after the ruling on #7 Motion for Remand by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Solis-Rainey, Rosa) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (EDS).
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 , #2 , #3 , #4 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. In this instance, documents signed by Attorney Mark Hutchison were filed using the CM/ECF account of Attorney Todd Moody, in violation of the Local Rules. Please note: No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff City of North Las Vegas. Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Mtn2Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judicial Opinio M2Remand, #3 Exhibit 3 - WV2018Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Remand (Anderson County), #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Granting Remand (Weber County), #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Remand (Uintah County), #7 Exhibit 7 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL2804, #9 Exhibit 9 - CMO, #10 Exhibit 10- Dinwiddie Cty v. Purdue Pharma) (Adams, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lester C. Houtz and Alex J. Harris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/27/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
December 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Nature of Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1 by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Moody, Todd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Moody, Todd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Moody, Todd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-800699-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5811390) by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co.. Proof of service due by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Docket, #2 Exhibit Ex B Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex C Other Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Ex D Opinion & Order, #5 Exhibit Ex E Mem & Order, #6 Exhibit Ex F Order, #7 Exhibit Ex G Order)(Moody, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of North Las Vegas v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Guinn
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 6 Inc.
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Tennessee Distribution L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Represented By: Rosa Solis-Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida B Maxsam
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414 LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Holper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: John A. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Lawrence J Semenza, III
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & R Pharmacy
Represented By: Patricia E. Daehnke
Represented By: Amanda Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Technologies LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Holper M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Guinn
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of North Las Vegas
Represented By: Richard Hy
Represented By: Robert M. Adams
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Micaela L. Rustia Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?