City of Henderson v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Henderson
Defendant: Actavis Inc., Beverly Sackler, Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., CVS Tennessee Distribution L.L.C., Jonathan D Sackler, McKesson Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Aida B Maxsam, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, David A. Sackler, Allergan USA Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Steven A. Holper, Beacon Company, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Rosebay Medical Company L.P., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Richard S Sackler, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, C & R Pharmacy, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC, Steven A. Holper M.D., Specgx LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Noramco, Inc., Kathe A Sackler, Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC, Allergan Inc. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02145
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite Decision re #8 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff City of Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Adams, Robert) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (MMM).
January 15, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Decision by City of Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Adams, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to remove attorney Nicholas G. Vaskov from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff City of Henderson. (Adams, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Order, #3 Exhibit Order, #4 Exhibit Order) (Hutchison, Mark)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #24 . Attorney Nicholas G. Vaskov is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Moody, Todd)
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE Notice of Decision by City of Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Adams, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Plaintiff City of Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Remand Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order of Severance & Order of Remand) (Adams, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff City of Henderson. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion to Remand and Denying Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Vacating CTO, #4 Exhibit 4 - VA Order) (Adams, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court,, by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #17 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3. Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits or made part of an appendix.Attorney Mark Hutchison is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minutes of the Court (ECF 5)) (Hutchison, Mark)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Fourth Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction by Aida B Maxsam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Barr, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation added. (Rickard, Jarrod)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Allegiance Corporation, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 100, Inc. for Cardinal Health Inc.; Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 2, LLC, Other Affiliate EPIC Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 8, LLC for Cardinal Health 6 Inc.; Other Affiliate EPIC Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Cardinal Health 8, LLC for Cardinal Health Technologies LLC added. (Jorgensen, J)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 JOINDER to #9 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendants Cardinal Health 6 Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health Technologies LLC. (Jorgensen, J)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by McKesson Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Solis-Rainey, Rosa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #9 : Event changed from Stipulation to Joint Motion by Court, pursuant to LR 7-1(c). (no image attached) (MMM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by City of Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) to Extend Time to Answer/Respond pending Resolution of #8 Motion to Remand by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Solis-Rainey, Rosa) Modified event on 12/18/2019 (MMM).
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff City of Henderson. Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Mtn2Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judicial Opinio M2Remand, #3 Exhibit 3 - WV2018Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Mtn2Remand (Anderson County), #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Granting Remand Weber County, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Remand (Unitah County), #7 Exhibit 7 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL2804, #9 Exhibit 9 - CMO, #10 Exhibit 10- Dinwiddie Cty v. Purdue Pharma) (Adams, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Nicholas G. Vaskov is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF Nos. #1 , #2 , and #3 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Todd Moody and Mark Hutchison. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lester C. Houtz and Alex J. Harris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/27/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
December 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Nature of Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1 by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Moody, Todd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Moody, Todd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-800695-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5811491) by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co.. Proof of service due by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Docket, #2 Exhibit Ex B Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex C Other Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Ex D Opinion & Order, #5 Exhibit Ex E Mem. & Order, #6 Exhibit Ex F Order, #7 Errata Ex G Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moody, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Henderson v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Donna Welch
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holper Out-Patients Medical Center, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Guinn
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 6 Inc.
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Tennessee Distribution L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Represented By: Rosa Solis-Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida B Maxsam
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414 LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Holper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: John A. Hunt
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Lawrence J Semenza, III
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & R Pharmacy
Represented By: Patricia E. Daehnke
Represented By: Amanda Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lester C. Houtz
Represented By: Todd L Moody
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Technologies LLC
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Holper M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Guinn
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Represented By: Abraham G. Smith
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Joel D. Henriod
Represented By: Daniel F. Polsenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Henderson
Represented By: Nicholas G. Vaskov
Represented By: Richard Hy
Represented By: Robert M. Adams
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Nancy D Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?