Lamb v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Patric Lamb
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00514
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Target Corporation. (Young, Loren)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patric Lamb. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jackson, Charles)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/13/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/28/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-810292-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5925297) by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Declaration re Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, #5 Jury Demand, #6 Declaration of Service) (Young, Loren) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified - Regenerated NEF after addition of Plaintiff's counsel on 3/13/2020 (DRS). Modified on 3/13/2020 to edit descriptions of attachments (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Loren Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patric Lamb
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Charles S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?