Bell v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Gladys Bell
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01448
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 NON-OPPOSITION to #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Fowler, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Kathleen Gladys Bell. (Randall, Justin)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Justin G. Randall for Plaintiff Kathleen Gladys Bell. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must appear in person for the scheduled hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Justin G. Randall for Plaintiff Kathleen Gladys Bell. (Randall, Justin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kathleen Gladys Bell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Randall, Justin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walgreen Co. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Walgreen Co for Walgreen Co. added. (Driscoll, Vicki)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-20-815088-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6113544) by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Driscoll, Vicki) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: James F Holtz
Represented By: Jason Andrew Fowler
Represented By: Vicki L. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Gladys Bell
Represented By: Justin G. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?