Benedict v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Benedict
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00245
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/9/2021. Motions due by 12/9/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Michael Benedict. (Drummond, Craig)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Teegarden, Tara)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/12/2021.(Grames, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal (First Request). State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer to #1 Petition for Removal by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl) Modified on 2/17/2021 (EDS).
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Benedict. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Drummond, Craig)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/16/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/3/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 12, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Grames, Cheryl)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-826794-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6368956) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Errata, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grames, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedict v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Cheryl A. Grames
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Tara Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benedict
Represented By: Liberty Ann Ringor
Represented By: Craig W Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?