National Labor Relations Board v. Red Rock Resorts Inc. et al
Defendant: NP Sunset LLC d/b/a Sunset Station Hotel & Casino, NP Texas, LLC d/b/a Texas Station Gambling Hall & Hotel, NP Lake Mead LLC d/b/a Fiesta Henderson Casino Hotel, NP Boulder, LLC d/b/a Boulder Station Hotel & Casino, FP Holdings, L.P. d/b/a Palms Casino Resort, NP Fiesta LLC d/b/a Fiesta Rancho Hotel & Casino, NP Palace LLC d/b/a Palace Station Hotel & Casino, NP Santa Fe LLC d/b/a Santa Fe Station Hotel & Casino and NP Red Rock LLC d/b/a Red Rock Casino Resort & Spa
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Red Rock Resorts Inc., Station Holdco, LLC, Station Casinos, LLC, Station GVR Acquisition, LLC, NP Sunset LLC doing business as Sunset Station Hotel & Casino, NP Texas, LLC doing business as Texas Station Gambling Hall & Hotel, NP Lake Mead LLC doing business as Fiesta Henderson Casino Hotel, NP Boulder, LLC doing business as Boulder Station Hotel & Casino, FP Holdings, L.P. doing business as Palms Casino Resort, NP Fiesta LLC doing business as Fiesta Rancho Hotel & Casino, NP Palace LLC doing business as Palace Station Hotel & Casino, NP Santa Fe LLC doing business as Santa Fe Station Hotel & Casino and NP Red Rock LLC doing business as Red Rock Casino Resort & Spa
Case Number: 2:2021cv01986
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Respondents are hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than 1/10/2022, why the Court should not order them to produce all documents sought by the NLRB. Responses due by 1/18/2022. Replies due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua D. Nadreau and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark J Ricciardi. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/12/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua D. Nadreau and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Ricciardi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6697994) by Respondents FP Holdings, L.P., NP Boulder, LLC, NP Fiesta LLC, NP Lake Mead LLC, NP Palace LLC, NP Red Rock LLC, NP Santa Fe LLC, NP Sunset LLC, NP Texas, LLC, Red Rock Resorts Inc., Station Casinos, LLC, Station GVR Acquisition, LLC, Station Holdco, LLC. (Ricciardi, Mark)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition Enforce Administrative Summons/Subpoenas,, by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. Responses due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maldonado, Marinelly)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA to #1 Petition Enforce Administrative Summons/Subpoenas,, by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. (Maldonado, Marinelly)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Petition for Order to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum. Counsel is advised in the future that this type of case needs to be opened as a Miscellaneous case. Miscellaneous cases can not be opened online. The Clerk's Office must open them. As Plaintiff is a Government agency and no filing fee is required, documents can be mailed in, dropped off, or emailed to lv_public_docketing@nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (SLD)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Order to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index Index and Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Applicant Exhibits 1-2, #4 Exhibit Applicant Exhibits 3-7, #5 Exhibit Applicant Exhibits 8-10, #6 Exhibit Applicant Exhibits 11-14, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Enforcement of Subpoenas Duces Tecum, #9 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Demirok, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Red Rock Resorts Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Kyler Scheid
Represented By: Sara Sue Demirok
Represented By: Marinelly Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Red Rock Resorts Inc.
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Station Holdco, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Station Casinos, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Station GVR Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Sunset LLC doing business as Sunset Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Texas, LLC doing business as Texas Station Gambling Hall & Hotel
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Lake Mead LLC doing business as Fiesta Henderson Casino Hotel
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Boulder, LLC doing business as Boulder Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FP Holdings, L.P. doing business as Palms Casino Resort
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Fiesta LLC doing business as Fiesta Rancho Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Palace LLC doing business as Palace Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Santa Fe LLC doing business as Santa Fe Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NP Red Rock LLC doing business as Red Rock Casino Resort & Spa
Represented By: Joshua D Nadreau
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Sunset LLC d/b/a Sunset Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Texas, LLC d/b/a Texas Station Gambling Hall & Hotel
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Lake Mead LLC d/b/a Fiesta Henderson Casino Hotel
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Boulder, LLC d/b/a Boulder Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FP Holdings, L.P. d/b/a Palms Casino Resort
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Fiesta LLC d/b/a Fiesta Rancho Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Palace LLC d/b/a Palace Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Santa Fe LLC d/b/a Santa Fe Station Hotel & Casino
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Red Rock LLC d/b/a Red Rock Casino Resort & Spa
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?