Montague v. Mainwarning et al
Plaintiff: Harold E Montague
Defendant: Mainwarning, Harroun, Collier, Martin, Parks, Diguilo and Baras
Case Number: 2:2022cv00034
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to GENERAL ORDER 2012-01. Electronic filing of prisoner filings in civil rights cases at the following facilities is now mandatory: Ely State Prison, Florence McClure Womens Correctional Center, High Desert State Prison, Lovelock Correctional Center, Northern Nevada Correctional Center, Southern Desert Correctional Center, Warm Springs Correctional Center. (DRS)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold E Montague. (DRS)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/16/2022. A document requesting a court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter.See Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7. Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Mr Montague)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold E Montague. (HAM)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying without Prejudice #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is Ordered that on or before 3/11/2022, Plaintiff will either pay $402 filing fee in full, or file a complete IFP Application with the court. See Order for further details. It is further Ordered that if payment or IFP application is not submitted to the court by 3/11/2022, then this case will be subject to Dismissal without Prejudice. The Clerk of Court will retain the [1-1] Complaint, but not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application and Instructions. For Dissemination through the Law Library)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
January 6, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (KF)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold E Montague. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montague v. Mainwarning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold E Montague
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainwarning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harroun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diguilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?