IN EQUITY A-3 : UNITED STATES OF AMERICA V. ORR WATER DITCH COMPANY
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Avis E. Andrulli, Trustee Julius A Ballardini, Bridgewater Family Trust, Bureau of Reclamation, Churchill County School District, Reno City of, Sparks City of, Crowley Living Trust, Richard and Sandra Depaoli, DilLoreto Construction, RICHARD G. HILL, Acting Commissioner J William McDonald, Nevada State Engineer, Nevada System of Higher Education, Orr Water Ditch Company, Trustee Angela S Persigehl, Director Ken Salazar, Truckee Carson Irrigation District, Secretary United States Department Of Interior, Villacorta Living Trust and Washoe County Water Conservation District
Petitioner: Churchill, County Of, Fallon, City Of, North Valley Holdings, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Sierra Pacific Power Company, Somersett Development Company, LTD, Tahoe Reno Commercial Center, LLC and Truckee Meadows Water Authority
Respondent: Avis E. Andrulli, Churchill County et al., Reno City of, Sparks City of, Alma Depaoli, Raymond Depaoli, Richard and Sandra Depaoli, John and/or Jane Doe, Barbara Gonzales, Kenneth G. McDonald and Washoe County
Interested Party: 301 Flint Street, LLC, B. Lorraine Griffin Trust, Bordertown, Inc., Bremner Living Trust, City of Fernley, Corona Cyan, LLC, KENNETH DILLON, SANDRA DILLON, JOHN DUDLEY, KATHRYN DUDLEY, Fallon Paiute-Shoshone Tribe, Daniel B. Franich, Tony Guillen, SHERRI L HILL, HILL PROPERTIES II LTD., HILL PROPERTIES LTD., OLIVE M HILL SHRODER, Charles W. Hanks, Rosemary S. Hanks, Lakeside Meadows, Inc, Last Chance Irrigation Company, Newlands Water Protective Association, Regional Transportation Commission of Washoe County, S&PH LTD., Sentinel Real Estate Fund, Steamboat Canal & Irrigation Company, Garry Stone, Joe Viehland, Tricia Viehland, David S. Wolf and Workman Family Trust
775)883-9900 (fax: City of Fernley
: Distribution Only, Fernley, Town of, Nevada State Engineer, Nevada Tri Partners, Nevada, State Of, Harvey N. Rose, Kitty P. Rose, TopLine Investments, Truckee-Carson Irrigation District and Water Master
Intervenor: State of California
Intervenor Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:1973cv00003
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1860 ORDER Recognizing and Confirming Changes in Point of Diversion, Place of Use and Manner of Use of Decreed Water Right. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1847 ORDER Requiring Notice of Petition of Truckee Meadows Water Authority for Order Recognizing and Confirming Changes in Point of Diversion, Place of Use and Manner of Use of Decreed Water Right Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1832 ORDER APPROVING WATER MASTER'S BUDGET FOR 2020-2021... Re ECF No. 1828 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 1832 replaced on 2/10/2021) (PAV). Modified on 2/10/2021 to denote DISREGARD THIS ENTRY (DRM). Modified on 2/10/2021 to reflect incorrect image has been replaced (DRM).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1816 ORDER re ECF No. 1812 Notice of the Filing of Petition of the Water Master. The hearing as to the Petition (ECF No. 1811 ) is set for February 19, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. In the event no object ions are filed in this matter before February 4, 2021 at 4:00 PM, at the Court's discretion, an order may be entered based on the facts set forth in the Petition (ECF No. 1811 ). Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1793 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. 1783 Agreement of Funding Parties for Approval of Truckee River Operating Agreement Budget for Fiscal Year October 1, 2019 to September 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1745 ORDER approving Water Master's Budget for 2018-2019; Creating an Assessment to Replenish the Fund Heretofore Established to Pay the Expense of Conducting the Water Master's Office; Creating a Special Assessment to Continue the Fun d Heretofore Established to Pay the Expense of Special Administration of Steamboat Creek and the Washoe Lake or Upper Steamboat Creek and the Washoe Lake Reservoir; Apportioning the Costs Thereof; and Providing the Manner and Method for Collection Thereof; and Approving the Water Master's Administration of the Decree for 2017-2018. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1737 NOTICE of the Filing of Petition ECF No. 1726 of the Water Master for an Order Approving his General Budget and Creating an Special Assessments. Hearing on Petition set for 4/17/2019 at 10:00 A.M. Objections due by 4/15/2019 at 9:00 A.M. Signed by Clerk Debra K. Kempi on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1729 NOTICE of the Filing of Petition ECF No. 1726 of the Water Master for an Order Approving his General Budget and Creating an Special Assessments. Hearing on Petition set for 4/1/2019 at 10:00 A.M. Objections due by 3/25/2019 at 4:00 P.M. Signed by Clerk Debra K. Kempi on 2/22/2019 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 ORDER granting ECF No. 1724 Motion to Substitute Attorney James N. Bolotin in for Attorney Justina A. Caviglia on behalf of defednants State of Nevada and Nevada State Engineer. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1720 ORDER for Additional Funding Regarding Administration of Truckee River Operating Agreement. The United States Bureau of Reclamation shall pay to the funds already held by the Federal Water Master, when such funds are available, the additional sum of $300,000.00 to be used for the time period 10/1/2017 through 3/31/2019 for "Additional Studies and Services" under Truckee River Operating Agreement operation and management as set forth in Exhibit "D" of this Order. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 ORDER granting ECF No. 1710 Motion to Remove Rachel L. Wise from Service List. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1698 ORDER APPROVING WATER MASTER'S BUDGET FOR 2017-2018; CREATING AN ASSESSMENT TO REPLENISH THE FUND; CREATING A SPECIAL ASSESSMENT TO CONTINUE THE FUND HERETOFORE ESTABLISHED TO PAY THE EXPENSE OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION OF STEAMBOAT CREEK AND TH E WASHOE LAKE OR UPPER STEAMBOAT CREEK AND THE WASHOE LAKE RESERVOIR; APPORTIONING THE COSTS THEREOF; AND PROVIDING THE MANNER AND METHOD OF COLLECTION THEREOF; AND APPROVING THE WATER MASTER'S ADMINISTRATION OF THE DECREE FOR 2016-2017; re ECF No. 1697 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 ORDER granting ECF No. 1693 Motion to Remove Attorney Jan Zabriskie from Electronic Service List for this matter. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/31/2018.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1681 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT. This constitutes a final judgment of the dismissal, without prejudice, of Leslie G. Borges as a respondent to the claims in the Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe of Indians' Petition, originally filed 4/7/1993, regarding water rights. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1676 ORDER For Additional Funding Regarding Planning of Truckee River Operating Agreement. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1658 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 1656 Stipulated Partial Final Judgment, dismissing Respondent Leslie G. Borges from this action. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1639 NOTICE - Hearing re ECF No. 1638 Petition for Order re Budget and Assessments set for 3/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Reno Federal Court Building, Third Floor, before Judge Lloyd D. George. Objections to ECF No. 1638 Petition due by 2/17/2017. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1627 ORDER granting 1607 Motion to be Removed from Mailings. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1603 ORDER approving 1591 Petition of Water Master for an Order Approving His 2015-2016 General and Special Budgets; Creating Assessments and Special Assessments for 2015-2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 ORDER granting 1577 Motion for Order Approving 2014-2015 General and Special Budgets..., Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1574 ORDER MODIFYING THE FINAL DECREE ENTERED IN THIS CASE IN 1944. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT - This constitutes a final judgment of dismissal, without prejudice, of the City of Fernley as a respondent to the claims in the Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe of Indians' Petition, originally filed April 7, 1993, regarding water rights. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER granting 1559 Motion for Order Approving 2013-2014 Budget.... Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1527 ORDER on 1520 MOTION to be Removed from Service List. Valarie L. Furtado terminated. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1509 NOTICE of the filing of 1508 PROPOSED Notice of the Filing of Petition of the Water Master for an Order Approving His General Budget and Creating an Assessment; Approving his Special Budget and Creating Special Assessments Relative to the Supervisi on of the Waters of Steamboat Creek and the Washoe Lake Reservoir and for the Time of Hearing Thereof, and Directing the Filing by the Water Master of an Audited Report for the Fiscal Year Ending September 30, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that hearing on 1507 Petition and any objections thereto, will be held on the Third Floor, before the Honorable Lloyd D. George on Monday, February 11, 2013 at 10:00 AM in Reno, NV courtroom TBA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event no objections are filed in this matter before the 1st day of February 2013 at the court's discretion, and order may be entered based on the facts set forth in the petition filed herein. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 ORDER GRANTING 1474 Withdrawal and Dismissal of Claim with Prejudice as to MICHAEL CRAIG. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER GRANTING 1220 Letter. Richard S. Starkweather, Trustee, Starkweather Family Trust, may be removed from both the written and email notice lists for all further notices. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER RE: Proper Procedures of Notification and Distribution of Documents Filed (Participants Not Represented by Counsel and Participants Represented by Counsel) (See Order for specifics) See 1172 Order. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 ORDER. The Court clarifies that the Order of 04/02/2009 in Case 3:73-cv-00003-LDG did not dismiss plaintiffs action but rather allowed plaintiffs to file an amended complaint as a new action that relates back to the filing date of the original compla int. Accordingly, the complaint filed in 3:09-cv-170-LDG (D.Nev.) Is deemed to have been filed on 03/04/2009. The clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order in 3:09-cv-170-LDG (D.Nev.). (ack'd). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 02/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 ORDER APPROVING re 1156 Petition filed by Garry D. Stone, Water Master. To all interested person YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED of the Water Master requests for approval of the following: (1) his general budget and creating an assessment i n this matter; (2) approving his special budget and creating special assessments relative to the supervision of the waters of Steamboat or Galena Creek, Washoe Creek or upper Steamboat Creek and the Washoe Lake Reservoir for the period from October 1 , 2010, to September 30, 2011; (3) approving his audited report of his books, records and accounts, filed herein; (4) approving the operation of the Water Master's office for the period of time ending with the fiscal year ending September 30, 2010; (5) approving the bond of the Water Master, Garry D. Stone. FURTHER NOTIFIED that the hearing on the petition and any objections therein, will be held on February 15, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (courtroom to be determined). FURTHER NOTIFIED tha t any water users or interested persons may file written objections to the proposed budget and petition for order approving the same, and the said audited report. Objections are to be filed before February 8, 2011, at 4:00 p.m. to the office of the Clerk. Signed by Lance S. Wilson, Clerk for the United States District Court, District of Nevada on 12/07/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) Modified on 12/8/2010 to correct entry as not an "Order Approving" but and Order for notification of filing of petition. (KO)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING PLANNING FOR IMPLEMENTATION OF TRUCKEE RIVER OPERATING AGREEMENT. ( See pdf order for specifics ) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/15/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/15/2010 to reflect electronic distribution only (DRM).
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled a Case Management Conference for Monday, 10/4/2010 10:00 a.m. in Reno, NV. Courtroom: TBA. The purpose of the Conference will be to establish a schedule and proced ures for the resoluation of Motion to Amend the Orr Ditch Decree on its merits. Represented parties must file a written statement no later than Friday, 09/03/2010. Represented parties may file a response no later than Friday, 09/10/2010. Unreprese nted water right owners may file a written statement or response no later than Friday, 09/24/2010. All persons planning on attending the Conference must inform the Court no later than Friday, 09/10/2010. See Order for specifics. (Notice of Compliance is due by 9/10/2010. Notice of Compliance is due by 9/24/2010. Status Conference set for 10/4/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Lloyd D. George.) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 08/13/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) Modified on 8/13/2010 to correct spelling error. (MLC).
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER re procedure for subsequent notice and service for parties who have returned Notices of Appearance : Persons electing to receive electronic delivery of documents requested to please return, not later than Friday, July 23, 2010 the a ttached Notice Regarding Means for Service and Registration for Electronic Delivery of Documents - Orr Water Ditch Litigation . Persons who elect to NOT received electronic delivery of documents requested to complete and return the Notice Regarding Means for Service only, not later than Friday, July 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/1/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 ORDER. For good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the Pyramid Lake Paiute Indian Tribe's 919 Motion to Amend Petition is DENIED; that the PLPIT's 922 Motion to Substitute City of Fernley as Sucessor-in-Interest to Certain Par ties/Respondents Originally Named in the Petition is DENIED; that the PLPIT's 944 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED; that the City of Fernley's 971 Motion for Stay of Consideration OF PLPIT's Motion fo r Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT; that the City of Fernley's 956 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply is DENIED AS MOOT; that the PLPIT's 921 Motion to Clarify this Court's Order of 03/28/08, Order Rega rding Status of City of Fernley is GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: The court clarifies that the 03/28/2008, Order dismissed, without prejudice, the PLPT's Orr Ditch Petition as against each and every respondent, whether served or unserved, who is a predecessor-in-interest to the water right acquired from those respondents by any current owner of the underlying challenged water right, including the City of Fernley. The City of Fernley was not and is not a respondent. This Court's 03/28/2008, Order is amended by adding the following sentences at page 12, line 14: "That is, the Tribe's petitions are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to each served respondent who transferred to another person or entity, subseq uent to acknowledging service, their interest in the underlying water right for which the served respondent acknowledged service. Any served respondent who transferred only a portion of an underlying water right is dismissed only to the extent of the transferred water right." (See Order for specifics) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/21/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN EQUITY A-3 : UNITED STATES OF AMERICA V. ORR WATER DITCH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: 301 Flint Street, LLC
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: B. Lorraine Griffin Trust
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bordertown, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Winkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bremner Living Trust
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: City of Fernley
Represented By: Patrick Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Corona Cyan, LLC
Represented By: Debbie Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KENNETH DILLON
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SANDRA DILLON
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN DUDLEY
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KATHRYN DUDLEY
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fallon Paiute-Shoshone Tribe
Represented By: Steven H. Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniel B. Franich
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tony Guillen
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SHERRI L HILL
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HILL PROPERTIES II LTD.
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HILL PROPERTIES LTD.
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OLIVE M HILL SHRODER
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Charles W. Hanks
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rosemary S. Hanks
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lakeside Meadows, Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Pagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Last Chance Irrigation Company
Represented By: Michael A. Pagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Newlands Water Protective Association
Represented By: Jamie Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Regional Transportation Commission of Washoe County
Represented By: A. Stanyan Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: S&PH LTD.
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sentinel Real Estate Fund
Represented By: Debbie Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Steamboat Canal & Irrigation Company
Represented By: Michael A. Pagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Garry Stone
Represented By: Roger A. Bergmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joe Viehland
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tricia Viehland
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David S. Wolf
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Workman Family Trust
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis E. Andrulli
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Julius A Ballardini
Represented By: Karen A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgewater Family Trust
Represented By: Martin G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Stephen M. Macfarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill County School District
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno City of
Represented By: Susan B Rothe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Living Trust
Represented By: Martin G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard and Sandra Depaoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DilLoreto Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD G. HILL
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner J William McDonald
Represented By: Stephen M. Macfarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada State Engineer
Represented By: Michael L Wolz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada System of Higher Education
Represented By: Mary P Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orr Water Ditch Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Angela S Persigehl
Represented By: Karen A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ken Salazar
Represented By: Stephen M. Macfarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truckee Carson Irrigation District
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary United States Department Of Interior
Represented By: Stephen M. Macfarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villacorta Living Trust
Represented By: Martin G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe County Water Conservation District
Represented By: Michael A. Pagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Avis E. Andrulli
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Churchill County et al.
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reno City of
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sparks City of
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alma Depaoli
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Depaoli
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard and Sandra Depaoli
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John and/or Jane Doe
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Gonzales
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth G. McDonald
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Washoe County
Represented By: Dale E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Churchill, County Of
Represented By: Rusty D. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fallon, City Of
Represented By: Steven King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: North Valley Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe
Represented By: Christopher W Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Pacific Power Company
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Somersett Development Company, LTD
Represented By: Michael A. Pagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tahoe Reno Commercial Center, LLC
Represented By: Kirk C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Truckee Meadows Water Authority
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
775)883-9900 (fax: City of Fernley
Represented By: Patrick Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: John "Jack" W. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Rebecca A Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Michael L Wolz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Brent T. Kolvet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Marta A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Kitty P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Edwin D. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Roger A. Bergmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of California
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: John Jack W. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?