United States of America v. Walker River Irrigation
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Circle Bar N Ranch, L.L.C. et al., April Christine Deitrick, Kirt Allen Deitrick, Roy O. Fields, PINION RANCH ESTATES LLC, John David Sr. Stanley, Marlyse Reed Stanley, State of California Department of Fish and Game, Thomas Bobrick Trust and Walker River Irrigation District
Petitioner: 69841 Park Nichol's River Split Ranch, LLC, Blasco Family Limited and Ross E. de Lipkau
Respondent: Borsini Ranch, Inc., Break-A-Heart, LLC., California State Water Resources Control Board (SWRCB), California Trout, Inc., California, State Of, Circle Bar N Ranch, David J. & Pamela A. Peri Family Trust, Desert Pearl Farms, James J. Peri Family Trust, L & M Family Limited Partnership, Beverly Landolt, Joseph Landolt, Timothy A. Lukas, County Lyon, Mica Farms, LLC, Mineral, County Of, Mono, County of, Nevada State of Dept. of Wildlife, Nevada, State Of, Peavine Leasing, LLC, Peri Brothers & Sons, Pinenut Ranch Cattle Company, Stewart L. Somach, Sutter Ranch, U.S. Indian Affairs Bureau and Walker Lake Working Group
Counter Defendant: James J. Baran, George L Herbst, David Wallace Park, Mary Kathleen Park, VGR Limited Partnership and W B Park & Sons, LLC
Consol Defendant: Scott DeChambeau
Unknown: Thomas J. McKinney, Courtney Brown, Jill E. Drake, Kelly R. Chase, Scott McElroy and Alice E. Walker
775) 945-0700 (fax: Mineral County
541) 485-2457 (fax: Michael Axline
Interested Party: Hugh Ricci, Tracy Taylor and U.S. Water Commissioner's Board
Intervenor Defendant: State Water Resources Control Board
Intervenor Plaintiff: Walker River Paiute Tribe
Case Number: 3:1973cv00125
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1809 ORDER re ECF No. 1808 Motion : Any entity or person who participated as a party to the proceedings before the Nevada State Engineer with respect to Permit No. 92910-T shall have until March 20, 2024, in which to file any response or oppositi on to the Joint Petition (ECF No. 1807 ) of NDOW and the Conservancy to Temporarily Modify the Walker River Decree to Conform with Nevada State Engineer Instream Flow Water Rights Permit No. 92107-T. (See pdf order for additional specifics.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1806 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 1805 Substitution of Counsel : Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/6/2024. Attorney Nicole N. Ting for Nevada State of Dept. of Wildlife added. Attorney Anthony J. Walsh terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1804 ORDER Re: ECF No. 1803 Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel : Attorney Alexa V. Penalosa substituted in place and stead of David L. Negri for USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 2/7/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1799 ORDER TEMPORARILY MODIFYING WALKER RIVER DECREE - See PDF Order for additional specifics. This temporary modification of Paragraph VIII of the Walker River Decree will terminate when the temporary changes provided for in the Order of the Californ ia State Water Resources Control Board expire as provided in paragraph 1 of that Order (ECF 1791-3 at p. 16-17 (RSM000020 RSM000021) and upon such termination, the sentence added herien to the end of Paragraph VIII be, and hereby is, ipso facto deleted from Paragraph VIII without any further action by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1797 ORDER APPOINTING MEMBER OF BOARD FOR THE UNITED STATES WATER COMMISSIONERS FOR DIVISION 6. IT IS ORDERED that Harold J. Curti, Jr. be, and he hereby is, appointed as a member of the Board of the United States Water Commissioners to succeed Bruce Park to represent Division No. 6, all in accordance with the Court Decree, In Equity C-125, to serve as a member of such Board until the further order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1780 NOTICE of Filing of Report and Petition for Approval of Budget and Approval of Rate Assessment for the Year July 1, 2023 Through June 30, 2024, and for Approval of the Audit Report for the Year Ended June 30, 2022; Re: ECF Nos. 1775 Petition; 1777 Proposed Notice. A hearing on ECF No. 1775 Petition and any objections thereto will be held in Courtroom No. 5, on Friday, June 9, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Written objections to petition must be filed and served on or before Frid ay, May 26, 2023. If no objections are filed by May 26, 2023, the Court may consider vacating the hearing set for June 9, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER granting 1765 Stipulation and proposed order for withdrawal of Motion for Order of the Court directing Chief Deputy Water Commissioner to Fully Administer Approved Instream Flow Permits. See order for specifics on the agreement of the parti es. The Walker Basin Conservancy's motion for Order of the Court directing Chief Deputy Water Commissioner to Fully Administer Approved Instream Flow Permits (ECF No. 1734] is deemed withdrawn. The hearing set for 2/16/2023 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du is vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 ORDER REQUIRING POSTING AND PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF VACANCY IN DIVISION NO. 6 UNITED STATES BOARD OF WATER COMMISSIONERS -IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the NOTICE OF VACANCY IN DIVISION NO. 6 UNITED STATES BOARD OF WATER COMMISSIONERS shall be given by the UNITED STATES BOARD OF WATER COMMISSIONERS by posting and publication. The NOTICE OF VACANCY shall be posted by the by the UNITED STATES BOARD OF WATER COMMISSIONERS within fifteen (15) days at the locations contained herein.Notice shall also be given by publication to commence within fifteen (15) days for two (2) consecutive weeks in the Lyon County News Leader, Yerington, Nevada; the Record Courier, Gardnerville, Nevada; and the Mammoth Times, Mammoth Lakes, California.Upon expiration of the completed application deadline contained in the Notice, the Clerk of the Court shall provide copies of all completed applications to KAREN A. PETERSON, Attorney for the UNITED STATES BOARD OF WATER COMMISSIONERS, at 402 North Division Street, Carson City, Nevada 89703, email: kpeterson@allisonmackenzie.com.Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1745 ORDER TEMPORARILY MODIFYING WALKER RIVER DECREE RE PERMIT NO. 90920-T as detailed herein - Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 ORDER granting ECF No. 1743 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 1742 Response re ECF No. 1734 Motion for Order re Approved Instream Flow Permits due by 10/11/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 ORDER granting ECF No. 1735 Stipulation. Any party to this action shall have up to and including September 20, 2022, in which to file and serve a Response to the Conservancy's Motion (ECF No. 1734 ). (Responses due by 9/20/2022.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 ORDER APPROVING BUDGET AND RATE OF ASSESSMENT FOR THE YEAR JULY 1, 2022 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2023, AND THE AUDIT REPORT FOR THE YEAR ENDED JUNE 30, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1719 ORDER Modifying Walker River Decree to Conform with Nevada State Engineer Instream Flow Water Rights Permit No. 90690; re ECF No. 1699 Motion, Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 ORDER granting ECF No. 1708 Motion for Approval; and Establishing Schedule re ECF No. 1707 Motion : Any entity or person who participated as a party to the proceedings before the California State Water Resources Control Board shall have until 5/4/2022 to file Responses to ECF 1707 ; Replies due by 5/18/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1696 ORDER granting ECF No. 1695 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel : Incoming District Attorney T. Jaren Stanton in the place and stead of Sean Rowe for Mineral County, Nevada; and for Walker Lake Working Group. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 ORDER granting ECF No. 1693 Motion; Attorney Holly A. Vance substituted in the place and stead of Attorney Greg Addington for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1692 ORDER Modifying Walker River Decree Regarding Water Right Permit No. 90429, granting ECF No. 1682 Motion; re ECF No. 1691 Proposed Order submission. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1690 ORDER granting ECF No. 1689 Substitution of Counsel. Deputy Attorney General Tori N. Sundheim removed from docket. Anthony J. Walsh added to docket as representing the interests of the State of Nevada, ex rel., the Nevada Department of Wildlife. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1685 ORDER granting ECF No. 1684 Motion to Establish Schedule : Any response/opposition to ECF No. 1682 Motion for Modification of Decree due by 8/24/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1680 ORDER Approving Budget and Rate of Assessment for the year July 1, 2021 through June 30, 2022, and the Audit Report for the year ended June 30, 2020 re ECF No. 1679 Proposed Order and ECF No. 1664 Report and Petition for Approval of Budget. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1671 ORDER re ECF No. 1669 Proposed Notice : Objections to Petition (ECF No. 1664 ) for approval of budget and rate assessment must be filed on or before Friday, May 14, 2021, and must be served on the same day on counsel for Petitioners . If no objections are filed by May 14, 2021, the Court may consider vacating the hearing set for May 27, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 4/22/2021 to fix hyperlink (DRM).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 ORDER granting ECF No. 1639 Motion to Modify Walker River Decree to Conform with Nevada State Engineer Instream Flow Water Rights Permit Nos. 88160, 88161 and 88162. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 ORDER Re: ECF No. 1650 Joint Status Report : 1. The Tribe and United States will file motion(s) on or before October 16, 2020. 2. USBWC and WRID will file responses on or before November 20, 2020. 3. The Tribe and United States will fil e replie(s) on or before December 11, 2020. 4. The Parties shall immediately inform the Court if they have resolved their disputethrough agreement. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 ORDER Re: ECF No. 1639 Petition. Responses or opposition due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1609 Notice of Filing of Report and Petition for Approval of Budget and Approval of Rate of Assessment for the year July 1, 2020 through June 30, 2021, and for Approval of the Audit Report for the year ended June 30, 2019. Telephonic Conference scheduled for 5/21/2020 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1601 ORDER granting ECF No. 1599 Stipulation : Attorney Sean A. Rowe for Mineral County and Walker Lake Working Group, substituted in the place and stead of Attorney Cheri Emm-Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1598 ORDER granting ECF No. 1597 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Miles B. H. Krieger's Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this case to Case no. 3:73-cv-00127-MMD-WGC (In Equity C-125-B). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 ORDER granting ECF No. 1594 Stipulation. See order pdf for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1593 ORDER granting ECF No. 1592 Stipulation. See order pdf for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORDER re Amended Order Approving Budget and Rate of Assessment for the year July 1, 2019 through June 30, 2020, and the Audit Report for the Year Ended June 30, 2018. (See order pdf for further details). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF FILING of Report and Petition for Approval of Budget, Approval of Rate of Assessment and Special Assessment for the year July 1, 2019 through June 30, 2020 and for approval of the audit report for the year ended June 30, 201 8 (ECF No. 1551 .) Hearing set for 6/3/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Miranda M. Du in Reno Courtroom 5. Notice shall be given by posting and publication. See order for details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDER approving ECF No. 1549 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Miles B. H. Krieger on behalf of Centennial Livestock and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jerry Snyder. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1548 ORDER MODIFYING WALKER RIVER DECREE TO CONFORM WITH STATE ENGINEER RULING NO. 6271 RE INSTREAM FLOW WATER RIGHTS PERMIT NO. 80700. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 ORDER TEMPORARILY MODIFYING WALKER RIVER DECREE (see Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 ORDER MODIFYING DECREE (see Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 ORDER - The Court vacates the Order (ECF No. 1340 ) denying (1) the National Fish and Wildlife Foundations (NFWF) petition to confirm Nevada State Engineer Ruling No. 6271 and to modify the Decree accordingly (ECF No. 1221 ) and (2) the Walker R iver Irrigation Districts (WRID) petition to approve the California State Water Resources Control Boards report and to temporarily modify the Decree consistent with said report (ECF No. 1249 ). These referenced petitions (ECF Nos. 1221 , 1249 ) are granted. The Court directs the parties to submit a joint status report within fifteen (15) days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 ORDER Approving Budget and Rate of Assessment for the Year July 1, 2018 Through June 30, 2019, and the Audit Report for the Year Ended June 30, 2017 re ECF No. 1503 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 ORDER granting ECF No. 1489 Interested Party Nevada State Engineer's Motion to Substitute Attorney Justina A. Caviglia in for Attorney Micheline N. Fairbank. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1485 ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF FILING OF REPORT AND PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF BUDGET AND APPROVAL OF RATE OF ASSESSMENT FOR THE YEAR JULY 1, 2018 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2019, AND APPROVAL OF THE AUDIT REPORT FOR THE YEAR ENDED JUNE 30, 2017 re: 1482 Notice/Proposed Order, Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 ORDER APPROVING BUDGET AND RATE OF ASSESSMENT FOR THE YEAR 7/1/2017 THROUGH 6/30/2018, AND THE AUDIT REPORT FOR THE YEAR ENDED 6/30/2016, re ECF No. 1473 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 ORDER re ECF No. 1460 Proposed Order, appointing Water Commissioner for Division 1. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 ORDER Requiring Posting and Publication re ECF No. 1447 Notice of Vacancy in Division 1, United States Board of Water Commissioners : Applications may be obtained on or before March 3, 2017. Applications due by March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 1419 Motion to Vacate Hearing : ORDERED that Oral argument re ECF No. 1395 Motion for enforcement of decree is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to Wednesday 10/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER approving ECF No. 1407 Stipulation re ECF No. 1395 Motion for Enforcement of the Walker River Decree. Reply due by 8/9/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 ORDER Approving ECF No. 1375 Budget and Rate of Assessment for the Year 7/1/2016 through 6/30/2017, and the Audit Report for the Year Ended 6/30/2015, re ECF No. 1389 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 ORDER approving Budget and Rate of Assessment for the Year July 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2016, and the Audit Report for the Year Ended June 30, 2014 re 1335 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ORDER REQUIRING POSTING AND PUBLICATION re # 1290 Notice of Vacancy in Division 3 U.S. Board of Water Commissioners. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER Requiring Posting and Publication of 1196 Notice of Vacancy in Division 5 - United States Board of Water Commissioners. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 10/22/2013 to add hyperlink (DRM).
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 ORDER re 1178 Notice of Withdrawal : Susan L. Schneider withdrawn as attorney of record for the United States of America effective this 30th day of July, 2013. Attorney for the United States, Andrew "Guss" Guarino, replaces her as lead counsel for the United States of America in this proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 7/30/2013 to correct name of judicial officer (DRM).
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDERED that Ms. Schneider's # 1168 Request to appear telephonically is DENIED. Ms. Schneider shall appear in person for the Status Conference on July 25, 2013, 10:00 A.M., in Reno Courtroom 6, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William C. Cobb. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ORDER re 1143 Proposed Order Submission Requiring Notice of Filing of Report and Petition for Approval of Rate of Assessment for the Year July 1, 2013 Through June 30, 2014, and for Approval of the Audit Report for the Year Ended June 30, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER re 1107 Notice and 1109 Notice. IT IS ORDERED that the United States Board of Water Examiners may participate in the administrative hearing as a full party to the proceedings, taking any and all positions that it deems appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/14/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER APPROVING BUDGET AND RATE OF ASSESSMENT FOR THE YEAR JULY 1, 2012 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2013, AND THE AUDIT REPORT FOR THE YEAR ENDED JUNE 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDERED that WRID's objections to the Successor-in-Interest Order (B-##1652, 1653; C-##543, 544) and WRID's objections to the Service Cut-off Order (B-#1663, 1664) are OVERRULED. WRID's objections to the 9/27/11 Order (C-##552, 553) are GRANTED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART; granted with respect to the Magistrate Judge's dismissal of Michael Sherlock as a defendant, and overruled with respect to all other issues in the 9/27/11 Order. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN ISSUES ADDRESSED AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE OF MARCH 13, 2012. ( Ref. 1074 Order. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/16/2012.(Electronic service only per Order #1300 in C-125-B (3-73-cv-127) and Order # 1075 in this case - DRM)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 CORRECTED ORDER MODIFYING DECREE re 1060 Order Modifying Decree; 1061 / 1062 Submission of proposed order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 ORDER MODIFYING DECREE. ( see pdf order for specifics ) This modification of Decree shall be deemed not to affect the rights other than that portion of Claim No. 173 set forth (herein) or the rights of any other parties. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER MODIFYING DECREE re 1038 Proposed Order. ( See pdf Order for specifics. ) The United States shall serve a copy of this Order within 3 business days of its entry by mail or email on all parties required to be served by Sec. 7.2 of the Administrative Rules and file proof of such service with this Court. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/1/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER A copy of Petition shall be served by 8/10/2011(as specified herein); Objections to Petition are due by 9/18/2011, and served (as specified herein); A hearing on the Petition is set for Tuesday, November 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m.< /B> in Courtroom No. 3. A copy of this Order shall be served by 8/10/2011 (as specified herein). Proof of such service shall be filed with this Court prior to the hearing on the Petition. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 7/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 ORDER Re: 1011 - IT IS ORDERED that a hearing on the Report and Petition for Approval of Budget and Approval of Rate of Assessment for the Year 7/1/2011 - 6/30/2012, and for Approval of the Audit Report for the Year Ended 6/30/2010 filed 4/8/2011, is set for Tuesday, 5/31/2011 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Edward C. Reed Jr. Notice shall be given by posting and publication. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr. on 4/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 998 ORDER APPROVING BUDGET AND RATE ASSESSMENT FOR THE YEAR JULY 1, 2010 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2011, AND THE AUDIT REPORT FOR THE YEAR ENDED JUNE 30, 2009, re 995 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 6/1/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Walker River Irrigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 69841 Park Nichol's River Split Ranch, LLC
Represented By: George N. Benesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blasco Family Limited
Represented By: George N. Benesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ross E. de Lipkau
Represented By: Ross E. de Lipkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: James J. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: George L Herbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David Wallace Park
Represented By: Brad M. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mary Kathleen Park
Represented By: Brad M. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: VGR Limited Partnership
Represented By: Gene M. Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: W B Park & Sons, LLC
Represented By: Brad M. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Borsini Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Break-A-Heart, LLC.
Represented By: George N. Benesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California State Water Resources Control Board (SWRCB)
Represented By: John Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Trout, Inc.
Represented By: David Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California, State Of
Represented By: Michael Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Circle Bar N Ranch
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David J. & Pamela A. Peri Family Trust
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Desert Pearl Farms
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James J. Peri Family Trust
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L & M Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Todd A. Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Beverly Landolt
Represented By: John W Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Landolt
Represented By: John W Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County Lyon
Represented By: George N. Benesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mica Farms, LLC
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mineral, County Of
Represented By: Cheri K Emm-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mono, County of
Represented By: Marshall S Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada State of Dept. of Wildlife
Represented By: Marta A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State Of
Represented By: Marta A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peavine Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Todd A. Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peri Brothers & Sons
Represented By: Todd A. Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pinenut Ranch Cattle Company
Represented By: George N. Benesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stewart L. Somach
Represented By: Stuart L. Somach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sutter Ranch
Represented By: George N. Benesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Indian Affairs Bureau
Represented By: Allen Anspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walker Lake Working Group
Represented By: Cheri K Emm-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle Bar N Ranch, L.L.C. et al.
Represented By: Laura A Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Christine Deitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirt Allen Deitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy O. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINION RANCH ESTATES LLC
Represented By: Gene M. Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Sr. Stanley
Represented By: David K. Baba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlyse Reed Stanley
Represented By: David K. Baba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Fish and Game
Represented By: Michael Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bobrick Trust
Represented By: Todd A. Plimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker River Irrigation District
Represented By: Gordon H. De Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol defendant: Scott DeChambeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Thomas J. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Courtney Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jill E. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kelly R. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Scott McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Alice E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
775) 945-0700 (fax: Mineral County
Represented By: Simeon M Herskovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
541) 485-2457 (fax: Michael Axline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hugh Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tracy Taylor
Represented By: Bryan L Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Water Commissioner&#039;s Board
Represented By: Karen A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State Water Resources Control Board
Represented By: Erin K.L. Mahaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Walker River Paiute Tribe
Represented By: Wes Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?