Larry M. Wisenbaker VS Craig Farwell, et al.
Plaintiff: |
Larry M. Wisenbaker |
Defendant: |
Jackie Crawford, Craig Farwell and Nevada Department Of Corrections |
Case Number: |
3:2003cv00500 |
Filed: |
March 10, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2011 |
Filing
134
ORDER. This case is scheduled for trial on the stacked calendar of 2/28/2012. IT IS ORDERED that this case is referred to The Honorable Valerie P. Cooke for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/10/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing
130
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's 129 proposed pretrial order is GRANTED in-part and DENIED in-part in accordance with this order. FURTHER ORDERED, defendant's separately filed 128 pretrial order is GRANTED in-part and DENI ED in-part in accordance with this order. FURTHER ORDERED, in accordance with Local Rule 16-3, the parties shall file and submit a proposed pretrial order consistent with this order within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
118
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's 108 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED, and D's 79 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/24/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
107
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 106 and denying 80 Motion to Enforce Settlement. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/19/2010.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER granting 94 Motion for order to produce prisoner at hearing set for April 1, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing
76
ORDER approving 75 Second UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Pretrial Order. ( Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/19/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
74
ORDER APPROVING 73 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time in which to file their proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 11/16/2009. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
|
September 23, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER denying 70 Motion to reset settlement conference. This case has been pending for six years since September 11, 2003 1 . The settlement conference shall proceed as set on October 6, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. 67 . The Office of the Attorney General shall make the necessary arrangements for plaintiff to be available in person for the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?