Padilla v. Gibbons et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Padilla
Defendant: Jim Gibbons, Howard Skolnick, E. K. McDaniel, Adam Endel, Debra Brooks, Harry Peltzer, Robert Chambliss and T. Jones
Case Number: 3:2007cv00442
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 122 Plaintiff's Motion for a Copy of Transcripts Designated in his Record on Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 12/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING P'S 84 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORD GRANTING Ds' 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORD DENYING P's 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORD DENYING as moot : 68 , 107 , 109 , 110 Motions. LET JUDGMENT ENTER ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/25/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 9/29/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and 58 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 56 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Exten sion of Time is GRANTED to the extent that Defendants shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/14/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.; denying 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 03/11/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Gibbons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Endel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Peltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chambliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?