Ortiz v. Nevada Department Of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Frank Ortiz
Defendant: Nevada Department Of Corrections, Isidro Baca, Debra Brooks, John Dibari, Robert Hendrix, Heather Hogencamp, David Homan, Charles Kirchen, E. K. McDaniel, William Moore, Jacob Murphy, Dwight Neven and Howard Skolnik
Case Number: 3:2007cv00531
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Carson City
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (# 55 ) is adopted and accepted, and P's # 47 Motion for Order Invalidating Settlement Agreement and Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this action and terminate it in its entirety. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/12/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS in whole the 37 R&R. FURTH ORD that Ds' 25 Motion to Enforce Settlement is GRANTED. FURTH ORD that P's 26 Motion is DENIED. FURTH ORD that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs and atty fees. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/23/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 26 Motion filed by Frank Ortiz to enforce settlement; and granting 25 Motion To Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by David Homan, Dwight Neven, John Dibari, Heather Hogencamp, Robert Hendrix, Charles Kirchen, Eldon McDaniel, Isidro Baca, Jacob Murphy, Howard Skolnik, William Moore, Debra Brooks. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Nevada Department Of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department Of Corrections
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Brooks
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dibari
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hendrix
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Hogencamp
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Homan
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Kirchen
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. K. McDaniel
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Moore
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Murphy
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnik
Represented By: Susan K. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?