Reberger v. Koehn et al
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, Gloria Carpenter, D. Jones and Michael Koehn
Case Number: 3:2015cv00468
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA B. CARRY ECF No. 120 ; Defendants' motion for summary judgment ECF No. 57 is granted; Plaintiff's Objection ECF No. 125 is overruled; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting ECF No. 121 Motion for Extension of Time to file objection to ECF No. 120 Report and Recommendation Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. 45 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objection; ECF No. 46 Objection Magistrate Judge Order is overruled. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting ECF No. 50 Motion to Extend Time : Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 49 Motion to Extend Time : Discovery resonse deadline extended to 6/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - IFP Application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED. NDOC shall pay Clerk $350 filing fee from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this order to Finance, and to NDOC Inmate Services. (Email (NEF) to Finance; copy mailed to NDOC 11/28/2017.) Cl erk shall SERVE this Order, and amended Complaint (ECF No. 18 ) upon AG. (E-service 11/28/2017; amended Complaint via NEF Regeneration.) AG shall advise by 12/19/2017 re acceptance of service; and file under seal address(es) for Ds for which servic e not accepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. Answer to complaint due by 1/27/2018. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that pursuant to the Courts Screening Order ECF No. 17 , this action to proceed against Defendants Dr. Koehn, Carpentar, Jones, Aranas, Dr. Donte, and George on Count I only; case STAYED 90 days to allow parties to settle their dispute befor e filing fee is paid; AG must file the report regarding the results of the 90 day stay; if the case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee; if party seeks exclusion from inmate mediation program, party must file a moti on to exclude case from mediation by 09/18/2017; directing Clerk to electronically serve copy of order, the original screening order ECF No. 17 and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ECF No. 18 on AG (E-service of Order and NEF regenerated ECF Nos 17 / 18 on 08/28/2017); directing AG to advise Court by 09/18/2017 whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendant for purpose of settlement. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 08/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice based on failure to pay filing fee. Motion to amend complaint 4 is denied as moot. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reberger v. Koehn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?