White v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: Howard Lee White
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, Isidro Baca, Jayson Brumfield and Tracey Green
Case Number: 3:2015cv00573
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for relief from judgment ECF No. 104 . Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb ECF No. 99 is accepted and adopted; Defendants' motion for summary judgment ECF No. 71 is granted; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion ECF No. 87 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; request to strike the Council declaration is DENIED; leave to file a sur-reply (which is contained within ECF No. 87 )is GRANTE D; motion to file a late pleading ECF No. 88 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants have up to and including 06/22/2018 to file a response to the sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER accepting and adopting the Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb ECF No. 50 ; Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction ECF No. 23 is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Documents and Exhibits on E-Filing (ECF No. 63 ) is GRANTED. The court has inserted Plaintiff's Exhibit A-5 after Exhibit A-4 and reimaged the document. (ECF No. 58 .) The Clerk shall SEND the parties the corrected version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and attachments (ECF No. 58 ). (Clerk re-generated NEF re # 58 Opposition on 10/16/2017 to effect electronic service upon all parties and counsel of record.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order DENYING Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 23 ). Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER extending stay through 12/30/2016; directing Defendants to file their status report by 12/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Lee White
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?