Street v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: Christopher I. Street
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, Isidro Baca, Candace Brockway, Karen Gedney and John Perry
Case Number: 3:2016cv00266
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the Court hereby ADOPTS AND ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge ECF No. 31 ; this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Clerk directed to close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that Plaintiff has until 4/17/2018 to file and serve a notice of intent to prosecute this action, along with a response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 23 ); Failure to do so will result in recommendation that this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Clerk must send Plaintiff a copy of the motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 23 ), supporting declarations and exhibits (ECF Nos. 23 -1 to 23 -12), sealed medical records (ECF Nos. 25 , 25 -1, 25 -2, 25 -3), pending motion for l eave to file medical records under seal (ECF No. 24 ), and Klingele Order (ECF No. 27 ). Plaintiff's response to ECF No. 23 motion for summary judgment due by 3/13/2018. All copies mailed to P on 2/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account; Clerk directed to SEND a copy of this order to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (sent on 04/13/2017); directing Clerk to e-ser ve NV AG with this order and the ECF No. 5 Complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 04/13/2017); service must be perfected by 07/12/2017; directing AG to advise Court by 05/04/2017 re acceptance of service; plaintiff to file a motion ide ntifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and address for the defendant(s); Answer due by 06/12/2017 for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 04/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CLARIFYING SCREENING ORDER (ECF No. 4 ) : THe order granting the application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 1 ) is vacated. Clerk is directed to reinstate IFP Application (ECF No. 1 ) as an active, pending motion. The Court defers a decision on the IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) until after mediation. This action stayed 90 days to allow parties opportunity to settle. AG shall file report re stay by 4/12/2017. If case does not settle, P shall pay $350 filing fee. If an y party seeks to have this case excluded from the inmate mediation program, that party shall file a "motion to exclude case from mediation" by 2/2/2017; response due 7 days thereafter; no reply shall be filed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Street v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Brockway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gedney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher I. Street
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?