Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians
Defendant: Jill C. Silvey and United States Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor Defendant: Carlin Resources, LLC
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv00268
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting ECF No. 150 Motion to Extend Time : 1. Hecla to file Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 143 ) and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 140 ) : December 1, 2021. 2. Federal Defendants to file Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 143 ) : December 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting ECF No. 148 Motion to Extend Time :1. Hecla to file Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 143 ) and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 140 : September 2, 2021.2. Federal Defendants to file Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 143 ) : September 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting ECF No. 146 Motion to Extend Time (Sixth Request) - Hecla to file Opposition to ECF No. 143 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of ECF No. 140 Motion for Summary Judgment: June 19, 2021. Federal Defendants to file Reply in Support of ECF No. 143 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment: July 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting ECF No. 144 Motion to Extend Time. Hecla's opposition to ECF No. 143 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and reply re ECF No. 140 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/5/2021. Federal Defendants' reply re ECF No. 143 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/26/2021. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting ECF No. 141 Joint Motion for Extension of Time as follows: 1. Federal Defendants to file Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Summary Judgment: December 11, 2020 2. Hecla to file Opposition to Cro ss-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment: January 22, 2021 3. Federal Defendants to file Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment: February 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting ECF No. 136 Motion to Extend Time as follows:1. Hecla to file Motion for Summary Judgment: September 14, 20202. Federal Defendants to file Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Summary Judgment: < b>October 30, 20203. Hecla to file Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment: November 13, 20204. Federal Defendants to file Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment: December 18, 2020Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting ECF No. 134 Motion to Extend Time : 1. Helca to File Motion for Summary Judgment: July 15, 2020.2. Federal Defendants to file Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Hecla's Motion for Summar y Judgment: August 31, 2020.3. Hecla to file Opposition to Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Hekla's Motion for Summary Judgment: September 14, 2020.4. Federal Defendants to file Reply in Support of their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment: October 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. 126 Intervenor Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file amended cross-claims. Amended cross-claims due by 6/18/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER- Plaintiff's motion to dismiss cross-claims (ECF No. 104 ) is DENIED without prejudice in accordance with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant-intervenor Carlin Resources, LLC shall have until 4/17/2018 to file amended cross-claims in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 82 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim, dismissing in its entirety Intervenor Carlin Resources Inc's ECF No. 77 Counterclaim; giving Intervenor Carlin Resources Inc 10 days to file cross-claims against Defendant Bureau of Land Management, if any. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant/Counter-Claimant Carlin Resources, LLC's Counterclaims. (response/ answer due 9/15/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 09/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 12 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 08/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting ECF No. 74 Motion to Seal; directing Clerk to seal ECF No. 72 Transcript; directing court reporter to file a redacted copy for the public record. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; copy also sent to D. Davidson - KR)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING ECF No. 63 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting ECF No. 23 Motion to Admit Government Attorney (Kristofor R. Swanson). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 3 Motion to Seal, in accordance with this order - ECF Nos. 1 , 2 , 3 , and 4 shall remain sealed; directing that all future documents filed in this action that parties believe should be filed unde r seal shall be filed in the following manner (see order for details); directing Plaintiff to serve full unredacted copies of all documents currently filed in this action, including this order, on the defendants. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians
Represented By: Scott R Daniel
Represented By: Jeffrey Rasmussen
Represented By: Rollie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Carlin Resources, LLC
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Represented By: Elizabeth A High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill C. Silvey
Represented By: Adam M. Bean
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Adam M. Bean
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?