Myers v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Myers
Defendant: Denkins, George, Giro, Gonzales, Lopez, Love, Perrinni and Wiggins
Case Number: 3:2016cv00491
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REFERRAL TO PRO BONO PROGRAM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case is referred to the Pro Bono Prgram for appointment of counsel; Clerk directed to forward order to the Pro Bono Liasion (e-served on 02/09/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that ADOPTS AND ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge ECF No. 26 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Deputy Gonzales from this action ECF No. 23 is GRANTED. Gonzales (Deputy) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 23 be GRANTED and Deputy Sheriff Gonzales be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 08/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/17/2017. Defendant Sheriff Ron Perini shall filed the last known addresses of defendants Lopez, Denkins, and Giro under seal on or before Friday, September 1, 2 017. Plaintiff's motion requesting issuance of summons and service (ECF No. 16) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a notice on or before Friday, September 1, 2017 advising the court if he wants to voluntarily dismiss this defendant w ho is deployed overseas on military duty, or othewise. Clerk shall ISSUE summonses for Deputy Sheriff Lopez, Deputy Sheriff Denkins, and Deputy Sheriff Giro and send the same to the USM with the addresses once they are provided under seal. The C lerk shall SEND to plaintiff four USM-285 forms. (Mailed to P 8/17/2017.) The Clerk shall SEND sufficient copies of the complaint (ECF No. 7 ), and this order to the USM for service on the defendants. Plaintiff shall have until Friday, September 1, 2017, to complete the USM-285 service forms and return them to USM. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrinni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Myers
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?