Williams v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Mathew Lee Williams
Respondent: Timothy Filson and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2016cv00505
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 85 ) and Motion for Stay and Abeyance (ECF No. 84 ) are denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying ECF No. 39 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying Petitioner a certificate of appealability; directing Clerk to substitute Renee Baker for William Gittere as respondent warden on the docket; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that Petitioner's motion for reconsideration (ECF Nos. 77 , 78 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time Nunc Pro Tunc (ECF No. 74 ) is granted; Petitioner's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 72 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Presentence Report Under Seal and in camera ECF No. 67 is granted; Clerk directed to separately file the presentence investigation report ECF No. 67 -1, under seal, as Exhibit 91; Clerk directed to substitute William Gittere for Isidro Baca on the docket for this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 51 is granting in part and denying in part; Petitioner's Motion to Stay ECF No. 52 is denied; Respondents to file answer by 10/15/2018; petitioner will then have (90) days to file reply; Clerk directed to substitute Isidro Baca for Brian Williams, Sr., on the docket as the respondent warden. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting ECF No. 47 Motion to Extend Time to respond to ECF No. 39 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' response/answer due 11/13/2017. In all other respects, the scheduled set forth in ECF No. 38 Order remains in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying Petitioner's ECF No. 44 Motion Requesting Judicial Review and Action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 25 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, 32 Motion to Stay and Abeyance, 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 34 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting ECF No. [3 1] Motion for Leave to File to Amend. Petitioner is granted leave to file his amended habeas petition. Clerk directed to separately file petitioner's amended habeas petition attached as exhibit to motion ECF No. 31 . Respondents will have 9 0 days to file an answer or other response; petitioner will have 60 days from the date the answer is served to file and serve a reply. If motion to dismiss is filed, petitioner will have 60 days from the date the motion is served to file and serve a response to the motion and respondents shall have 30 days to file a reply in support of the motion. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Respondents' ECF No. 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot Petitioner's ECF No. 21 Motion for Stay; giving Respondents 90 days to file response to remaining claims in petition. Reply due within 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Respondents' ECF No. 18 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit in Camera and Under Seal; giving Petitioner 60 days to file response to Resopndents' ECF No. 14 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Clerk shall separately file the petition for writ of habeas corpus and the motion for appointment of counsel, each attached to the IFP application at ECF No. 1 . Clerk of the Court add AG, as counsel for respondents. Clerk shall e-serv e Rs a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus and a copy of this order. (E-service on 9/28/2016.) Answer/response to petition due by 11/27/2016. Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Clerk shall substitute Timothy F ilson for Renee Baker, on the docket for this case, as the respondent warden of Ely State Prison, and will update the caption of the action to reflect this change. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Filson
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mathew Lee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?