Canada v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: |
Lester Canada |
Defendant: |
Isidro Baca, Beitler, Howell and Shreckengost |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00601 |
Filed: |
October 17, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 8, 2020 |
Filing
60
ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No. 59 Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 8, 2019 |
Filing
42
ORDER that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 36 ) is adopted in full; and Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 25 ) is granted in part, and denied in part. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); Clerk directed to e-serve a copy of this order and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ECF No. 3 on AG (e-service of order and NEF regeneration of ECF No. 3 on 01/16/2018); directing AG to advise Court by 02/06/2018 re acceptance of service; service must be perfected by < B>04/16/2018; if service cannot be accepted, Plaintiff shall file a motion identifying the unserved defendants(s), requesting issuance of a summons and specifying full name/address of the defendant(s); answer/response due by 03/18/2018 for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants a copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; case no longer stayed. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?