Quintero v. Aranan et al
Plaintiff: John Quintero
Defendant: Romeo Aranan, Isidro Baca, Connie Bisbee, Carnes, Dwayne Deal, Venus Fajota, Darla Foley, Linda Fox, Ed Gray, Peter Keegan, Adam Laxalt, E.K. McDaniel, Larry Pihson, Joseph Prieto, Dawn Rosenberg, Brian Sandoval, Pauline Simmons, Scott Sisco, James Stogner, David Tristan and James Wright
Case Number: 3:2016cv00673
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER accepting and adopting in full ECF Nos. 114 and 116 Report and Recommendations; granting ECF No. 62 Defendants' motion to dismiss; granting ECF No. 77 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; granting nun pro tunc ECF Nos. 89 and 90 Defendants Laxalt and Prieto's motions to extend time; denying ECF Nos. 81 Plaintiff's motion to strike and 98 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental evidence; deny ing as moot ECF Nos. 47 Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order, 48 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, 58 Plaintiff's motion requesting submission, 64 Defendants' motion to stay discovery, 66 Plaintiff's motion to strike; 74 Plaintiff's motion seeking a protective order, 84 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, and 86 Plaintiff's motion to extend time; directing Clerk to strike Plaintiff's reply briefs (ECF Nos. 122 , 123 ); directing Clerk to enter judgment in accordance with this order, and in Defendants' favor, and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED that Ds' motion to seal (ECF No. 100 ) is GRANTED. The presentence report was filed and shall remain under seal (ECF No. 101 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting ECF No. 91 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Responses due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 5/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 69 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. 56 Second Amended Complaint: Defendants' answer/response due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Motion : Answer/response to ECF No. 56 Second Amended Complaint due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN CARRY adopting in part and rejecting in part ECF No. 42 Report and Recommendation, declining to dismiss Counts III and V and adopting recommendation to dismis s Counts VII and VIII; granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 21 Motion for Leave to Amend; directing Clerk to file Second Amended Complaint; permitting Counts I, II, III, IV, V, and VI to proceed, dismissing without prejudice Count VII, dismissing with prejudice Count VIII. See order for full details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Motion to Extend Time re 3 Amended Complaint. Response due 30 days after this Court's determination of which complaint is controlling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying ECF No. 20 Motion for Reconsideration; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a copy of his motion for emergency injunction ECF No. 10 (mailed to plaintiff on 03/02/2018). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is granted. However, even if this action is dismissed plaintiff must pay the full $350 filing fee. Further ordered NDOC shall pay clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall send copy this order to Finance and NDOC inmate services. (E-service to Finance; mail to NDOC on 2/20/2018) Clerk shall E-serve AG this order and P's first amended complaint (ECF No. 3 ) by adding AG to docket sheet. (E-service 2/20/2018. First amended complaint (ECF No. 3 ) via NEF regeneration) AG shall advise by 3/13/2018 re acceptance of service, and file under seal address(es) for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re unserved Ds. If service accepted then answer due by 4/21/2018. Hencefo rth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. This case is no longer stayed. The motion for emergency injunction (ECF No. 10 is denied. The motion for copies (ECF No. 15 ) is denied in part and granted in part. Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. (Docket sheet mailed to P 2/20/2018.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Motion to Resend ECF No. 4 Screening Order; clerk directed to send P a copy of ECF No. 4 Screening Order (mailed to P at WSCC on 12/27/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero v. Aranan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Bisbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venus Fajota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Pihson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stogner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tristan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Quintero
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?