Hill v. Filson et al
Petitioner: Joaquin Broushon Hill
Respondent: Timothy Filson and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2016cv00694
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the Petition is dismissed without prejudice; a certificate of appealability is denied; Clerk directed to send Petitioner one copy of ECF No. 6 Petition (Mailed to P on 4/30/2019); Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - P shall file sworn declaration by 5/5/2019 re abandonment of unexhausted grounds or dismissal of petition without prejudice as specified herein. P's Motion for copies (ECF No. 38 ) is denied without prejudice. No further courtesy copies of any filings or exhibits are required at this time.Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - ECF No. 32 Motion for counsel is denied. ECF No. 28 Motion for stay is denied. P shall file sworn declaration re abandonment or dismissal by 10/20/2018. If P elects to abandon unexhausted grounds then answer to remaining grounds due 30 days after service of declaration; reply due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that ECF No. 8 respondents' motion to dismiss is granted in part; petitioner has 30 days to inform the Court how he will proceed by declaration or motion; this case may be dismissed if petitioner fails to respond to the order; EC F No. 17 petitioner's motion to respond to dismissal is granted; and ECF No. 20 petitioner's motion to courts is denied. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Clerk shall close case number 3:16-cv-00743-MMD-VPC as duplicative. Petitioner shall file any future documents in case number 3:16-cv-00694 only. Clerk shall file the IFP application that was docketed in case number 3:16-cv-00743-M MD-VPC into case number 3:16-cv-00694 as ECF No. 5 . The briefing schedule set forth below applies to case number 3:16-cv-00694. Petitioner's second IFP application (ECF No. 5 ) is granted. Clerk file and e-serve the petition (ECF No. 1 -1) on the respondents. (E-service 1/6/2017.) Clerk shall add AG as counsel for respondents. Answer/response to petition due by 4/6/2017. Reply/opposition to answer due 45 days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response. Any ad ditional state court record exhibits filed must be filed with a separate index of exhibits as specified herein. The parties must send courtesy copies of all exhibits in this case tor RenoStaff Attorney. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Filson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Filson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joaquin Broushon Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?