Stevens v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: Country Stevens
Defendant: Dr. David A. Mar and Brian Ward
Case Number: 3:2017cv00093
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 10/24/2019 at 9:00 AM in Reno Fifth Floor Chambers - before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr.. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Reno Clerk's Office - Room 301 no later than 4:00 PM on 10/17/2019. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL COPIES TO THE CLERKS OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Main Document 52 replaced on 7/29/2019) (KW).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting in full ECF No. 45 Report and Recommendation; denying Defendant's ECF No. 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 46 ) without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Plaintiff's "Motion for Violation of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 37.1(1)(2), Duty to Preserve Evidence, Sanctions for Spoilation, and FRCP Rule 34" ECF No. 22 is DENIED. Plaintiff's "Motion for Sanctions for Violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 34, Disclosures and Discovery" ECF No. 23 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and the ECF No. 8 Complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 06/22/2018); service must be perfected by 9/19/2018; directing AG to advise Court by 07/13/2018 re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; plaintiff to file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and address for the defendant(s); answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented; plaintiff shall se rve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; case no longer stayed. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David A. Mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Stevens
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?