Thomas v. Zachry et al
Plaintiff: Lori L Thomas
Defendant: John Harper, Storey County, Marna Zachry and Thomas Zachry
Case Number: 3:2017cv00219
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 64 Motion to Withdraw Kristan Elizabeth Lehtinen and Marni Rubin Watkins as attorneys for plaintiff. Plaintiff is hereby appearing as pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in-part and denying in-part ECF No. 58 Motion to Dismiss. The action shall proceed solely on the fourth cause of action. Defendant Storey County and its Board of Commissioners shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of EC F No. 41 Order on the current owner or interested parties by 12/10/2017. Interested parties have until 12/20/2017 to seek leave from the court to participate in this action. Defendants' status report due 1/9/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' ECF No. 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying ECF No. 29 Defendants' Motion to Consolidate the Preliminary Injunction Hearing with a Trial on the Merits. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 05/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff's ex parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order ECF No. 3 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Requ est for a Preliminary Injunction ECF No. 3 , Complaint ECF No. 1 , Summons, and a copy of this Order on Defendants no later than 04/13/2017; Defendants may file a response to the request for a preliminary injunction no later than 5:00 p.m . on 04/19/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply no later than 5:00 p.m. on 4/21/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's Request for a Preliminary Injunction is set for 4/25/2017 at 10:00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 04/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Zachry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harper
Represented By: Rick R. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storey County
Represented By: Charles L. Burcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marna Zachry
Represented By: Rick R. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Zachry
Represented By: Rick R. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori L Thomas
Represented By: Kristan Elizabeth Lehtinen
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?