Augborne v. Filson et al
Plaintiff: Brit F. Augborne, III
Defendant: Filson, Hammond, Homan and Stolkz
Case Number: 3:2017cv00393
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER adopting in its entirety ECF No. 65 Report and Recommendation; denying in part and granting in part ECF No. 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing from this action Defendant James Dzurenda; dismissing from this action the Eighth Amendment and conspiracy claims against Defendants John Doe 1 through 10; dismissing from this action the Fourteenth Amendment and supervisory liability claims against Defendant John Doe Associate Warden of Operations. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation of Dismissal, defendant Dennis Homan dismissed without prejudice; Signed by Chief Judge. De; Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Judge Carry's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 27 ) is adopted; Plaintiff will be permitted to proceed on the claims in the FAC as follows: Count I to proceed against Stolkz; Count II to proceed against Homan and John Does 1 through 10; Count III alleging supervisory liability to proceed against Dzurenda; Count IV to proceed against Filson; and Count V to proceed against John Doe AWO. The portion of Count III alleging a First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Dzurenda is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting ECF No. 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading is extended until after the Court rules on the request to screen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - IFP Application (ECF No. 6 ) is GRANTED. NDOC shall pay Clerk $350 filing fee from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this order to Finance and to NDOC Inmate Services. (Email (NEF) to Finance; copy mailed to NDOC, 10/31/20 18.) Clerk shall SERVE this Order, and Complaint (ECF No. 12 ) upon AG. (E-service 10/31/2018; Complaint via NEF Regeneration.) AG shall advise by 11/21/2018 re acceptance of service; and file under seal address(es) for Ds for which service not a ccepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. If service accepted, then answer/response to complaint due by 12/30/2018. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff to file his updated address with the Court by 6/10/2018; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Court shall dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER it is ordered that Plaintiff's letter ECF No. 7 is construed as a motion for reconsideration to reopen this case; the motion for reconsideration ECF No. 7 is granted; Clerk directed to vacate the dismissal order and judgment ECF No. 4 , 5 and reopen this case; the Court will rule on the application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 6 and screen the complaint ECF No. 1 -1 in a separate order. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Augborne v. Filson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit F. Augborne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stolkz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?