Broomfield v. Aranas et al
Plaintiff: |
Steven City Broomfield |
Defendant: |
Romeo Aranas, John Keast, C. Lucas, Dr. Noughton and Theresa Wickham |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00683 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 24, 2020 |
Filing
105
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - The Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No. 103 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear his own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/24/2020. (ECF Nos. 40 , 47 , 90 terminated). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
May 19, 2020 |
Filing
89
ORDER ECF No. 79 Motion for Leave to File supplemental briefing is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 5, 2019 |
Filing
76
ORDER DENYING ECF No. 70 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
November 20, 2019 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting ECF Nos. 63 64 Motions : Plaintiff is advised that the court received Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 59 ) and Plaintiff's Addendum//Exhibit in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 61 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 21, 2018 |
Filing
24
ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); Clerk directed to e-serve a copy of this order and Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. 11 on AG (e-service of order and NEF regeneration of ECF No. 11 on 12/21/2018); service to be perfected by 03/21/2019; directing AG to advise Court by 01/11/2019 re acceptance of service; if service cannot be accepted, Plaintiff shall file a motion identifying the unserved defendants(s), requesting issuance of a summons and specifying full name/address of the defendant(s); answer/response due by 2/19/2019 for any defe ndants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants a copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; case is no longer stayed. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting ECF No. 20 Motion for Extension of Time of the 90-Day Stay Period. 90-day stay continued to and report due by 12/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?