Birch v. DelPorto et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Birch
Defendant: Harold Wickham, Shanon Rose, Steve Sisolak, Dave Drummond, Pam DelPorto, William Gittere, Tashena Sandoval, William Dechon, John Borderman and Aaron Ford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00655
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION - Request for immedite emergency (2nd)..., filed by Plaintiff Bruce Birch. Responses due by 1/1/2020. (LH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Preliminary Injunction and on Restraining Order re ECF Nos. #3 , #4 , and #5 Motions, by Plaintiff Bruce Birch. (AB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order - Second Request, by Plaintiff Bruce Birch. Responses due by 12/26/2019.(AB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order -Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Bruce Birch. Pdf image identical to ECF No. #3 Motion. (LH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order, by Plaintiff Bruce Birch. Responses due by 12/23/2019. (LH)
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bruce Birch. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LH)
October 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birch v. DelPorto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanon Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sisolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam DelPorto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tashena Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dechon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Borderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?