Bartell Ranch LLC et al v. McCullough et al
Plaintiff: Bartell Ranch LLC and Edward Bartell
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management, Esther M McCullough and Ester M. McCullough
Intervenor Defendant: Lithium Nevada Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00080
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that Lithium Nevadas motion to intervene as of right (ECF No. #11 ) is granted. Lithium Nevada is admitted into this litigation as an Intervenor-Defendant, with full rights of participation. Lithium Nevada must file an answer. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #18 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to #17 Response by Intervenor Defendant Lithium Nevada Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Order Granting Lithium Nevada Corp.'s Motion to Intervene) (Granier, Laura) Modified on 4/1/2021 add link to motion #11 (WJ).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Intervene by Plaintiffs Edward Bartell, Bartell Ranch LLC. Replies due by 4/1/2021. (Carollo, Dominic)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving ECF No. #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hadassah M. Reimer for Lithium Nevada Corp. and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Laura K. Granier. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/23/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Hadassah M. Reimer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Laura K. Granier (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6415819) by Intervenor Defendant Lithium Nevada Corporation. (Granier, Laura)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Arwyn Carroll on behalf of Defendants Ester M. McCullough, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Carroll, Arwyn)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Hadassah M. Reimer to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/30/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lithium Nevada Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Granier, Laura)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Lithium Nevada Corporation. Responses due by 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Granier, Laura)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER : Case 3:21-cv-00103-LRH-CLB IS reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00103-MMD-CLB. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du, and Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dominic M. Carollo for Bartell Ranch, LLC and Edward Bartell, and approving Designation of Local Counsel O. Kent Maher. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/16/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Bartell Ranch LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Maher, O.)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management) (AB)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. The form requires an original signature of the party appointing local counsel. Attorney Dominic Carollo is advised to obtain the signature of his client representative and to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to ECF No. #5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. (no image attached) (PAV)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dominic M Carollo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel O Kent Maher (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6367071) by Plaintiff Bartell Ranch LLC. (Maher, O.)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bartell Ranch LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Maher, O.)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Dominic M. Carollo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/25/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6366767) by Bartell Ranch LLC. Proof of service due by 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Maher, O.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartell Ranch LLC et al v. McCullough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartell Ranch LLC
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Represented By: O. Kent Maher
Represented By: Dominic Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Bartell
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Represented By: O. Kent Maher
Represented By: Dominic Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Arwyn Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther M McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ester M. McCullough
Represented By: Arwyn Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Lithium Nevada Corporation
Represented By: Hadassah M Reimer
Represented By: Erica Kristen Nannini
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?