Western Watersheds Project et al v. Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Great Basin Resource Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Basin and Range Watch and Wildlands Defense
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior, Department of Interior and Ester M. McCullough
Intervenor Defendant: Lithium Nevada Corp.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00103
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lithium Nevada Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Granier, Laura)
April 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Lithium Nevada Corp.. Responses due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Lithium Nevada Corp's Proposed Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jonathan Evans in Support of Lithium Nevada Corps Motion to Intervene) (Granier, Laura)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Arwyn Carroll on behalf of Defendants Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior, Department of Interior, Ester M. McCullough. (Carroll, Arwyn)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Talasi B. Brooks is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey C. Parsons for Great Basin Resource Watch, Basin and Range Watch, and Wildlands Defense and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Christopher Mixson. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/4/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for attorney Talasi Brooks for Western Watersheds Project and approving Designation of Local Counsel for attorney Christopher Mixson. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/3/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by JEFFREY C. PARSONS and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel CHRISTOHPER MIXSON (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6391819) by Plaintiffs Basin and Range Watch, Great Basin Resource Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Wildlands Defense. (Mixson, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by TALASI BROOKS and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel CHRISTOHPER MIXSON (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6391245) by Plaintiffs Basin and Range Watch, Great Basin Resource Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Wildlands Defense. (Mixson, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving ECF No. #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/2/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by ROGER FLYNN and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel CHRISTOHPER MIXSON (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6389383) by Plaintiffs Basin and Range Watch, Great Basin Resource Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Wildlands Defense. (Mixson, Christopher)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER : Case reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00103-MMD-CLB. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du, and Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONSES ISSUED re ECF No. #1 Complaint - Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ester M. McCullough, #2 Summons Acting U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons Bureau of Land Management, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, #5 Summons U.S. Dept of the Interior) (KR)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Roger Flynn, Jeffrey C. Parsons and Talasi B. Brooks to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/12/2021. (no image attached) (LE)
February 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (LE)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Basin and Range Watch, Great Basin Resource Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Wildlands Defense. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mixson, Christopher)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior, Department of Interior, Ester M. McCullough (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6384654) by Wildlands Defense, Western Watersheds Project, Basin and Range Watch, Great Basin Resource Watch. Proof of service due by 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Mixson, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project et al v. Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Basin Resource Watch
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Christopher Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Talasi Brooks
Represented By: Christopher Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basin and Range Watch
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Christopher Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildlands Defense
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Christopher Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Arwyn Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Interior
Represented By: Arwyn Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ester M. McCullough
Represented By: Arwyn Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Lithium Nevada Corp.
Represented By: Erica Kristen Nannini
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?